Baker v. Adams
Petitioner: Donte Bernard Baker, Tay and Donnie
Respondent: Paul Adams
Case Number: 2:2022cv00114
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Copy of public docket placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Donte Bernard Baker Reg. No. 53722-037 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590. (dgar)
February 14, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from Donte Bernard Baker. (dgar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2022: #1 Envelope) (dgar, ).
February 8, 2022 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Donte Bernard Baker Reg. No. 53722-037 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590. (dgar)
February 8, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER. Petitioner Donte Bernard Baker filed a #1 petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 on April 20, 2021, in the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Petitioner was housed at FCI Hazelton in Preston County, West Virginia at the time of filing. On or around November 12, 2021, Petitioner was transferred to FCI Williamsburg in South Carolina, prompting him to file a #10 motion to transfer his case to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. On January 10, 2022, while Bakers motion was pending, the district court issued an #12 order to show cause, stating that [t]he undersigned has made a preliminary review of the petition and finds that summary dismissal of the same is not warranted. Therefore, the Warden shall have twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order to show cause why the writ should not be granted. On January 12, 2022, Assistant United States Attorney Erin K. Reisenweber filed a #13 response on Warden Adams behalf, consenting to the transfer of Bakers case to the District of South Carolina. As a result, the case was transferred by #14 order dated January 13, 2022, and is now before this Court for further consideration. As of this date, however, there has been no notice of appearance by the United States Attorneys Office for the District of South Carolina. The undersigned therefore directs Warden Adams to file a status report within ten (10) days of the date this Order is entered, informing the Court as to the status of counsel in this action and who from the Government intends to file a response to the order to show cause as to why the writ should not be granted. The Governments deadline to show cause shall be stayed and reset pending the response to this Order. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 02/08/2022. (msaw, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The petitioner's Motion (Doc. #10 ), which is unopposed by the respondent, is GRANTED, and this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for further consideration. The petitioner's Motion to Change Venue (Doc. #11 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/13/2022. (Copy PS Petitioner by cert. mail) (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Paul Adams to #11 MOTION to Change Venue, #10 MOTION to Transfer Case, #12 Order to Show Cause,. (Reisenweber, Erin) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Warden shall have twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order to show cause why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/10/2022. (Copy PS Petitioner by cert mail; to Sharon Potter by email and U.S. mail)(dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue by Donte Bernard Baker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address / MOTION to Transfer Case by Donte Bernard Baker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Address updated in CM/ECF) (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Donte Baker to Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on Per USPS 10/12/21. (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRNG CASES. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/5/2021. Copy to pro se parties by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2021: #44 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Donte Baker to Clerk of Court. Public docket sheet mailed to Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
July 11, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Instructions for linking your account can be found #here. PLEASE NOTE: The WVND CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 1:00 pm on Friday July 16, 2021 until 8:00 am Monday, July 19, 2021. An extension for electronic filing will be granted for all documents with court-imposed deadlines falling between 1:00 pm on Friday, July 16, 2021, and midnight on Sunday, July 18, 2021. All documents due during that period must be filed prior to 1:00 pm Friday, July 16, 2021, or on Monday, July 19, 2021. If you have any additional questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
June 19, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM?ECF system to Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen Cm/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have thei r own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-fling account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Please log in to the WVND CM/ECF system at https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/ before July 19, 2021 to make sure you know your current WVND e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVND Clerks CM/ECF Office Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
May 30, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice and #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/23/21. (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001831 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(mh) (Copy PS Petitioner via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2021: #2 PTAR Form) (mh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2021: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Petitioner via cert mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 against Paul Adams, filed by Donte Bernard Baker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-5, #2 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 1/13/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donte Bernard Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Adams
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Represented By: Sharon L. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?