Sink v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Sink
Defendant: BW/IP, INC., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Aurora Pump Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Byron Jackson Pump Company, Carver Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US, Inc., General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane Inc., Velan Valve Corp., ViacomCBS Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC and Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01316
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 49 TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tyler B. Wilke, who represents the Plaintiff, is granted admission Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/15/2022.(vdru, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tyler B. Wilke ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10542798) by Alexander Sink. Response to Motion due by 6/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Swett, William)
June 15, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC (Flynn, Stephanie)
June 3, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc..(Techman, Jennifer)
June 2, 2022 Filing 45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John)
June 2, 2022 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John)
June 1, 2022 Filing 43 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
June 1, 2022 Filing 42 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Viking Pump, Inc..(Cherry, Nicolas)
June 1, 2022 Filing 41 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carver Pump Company.(Cherry, Nicolas)
June 1, 2022 Filing 40 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 11/28/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/1/2022. (adic, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 39 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/22/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/6/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/6/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/27/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/26/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/26/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/26/2022, Discovery due by 11/28/2022, Motions due by 12/28/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 3/28/2023, Mediation Due by 11/28/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/1/2022. (adic, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
May 31, 2022 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Viking Pump, Inc..(Cherry, Nicolas)
May 31, 2022 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carver Pump Company.(Cherry, Nicolas)
May 31, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC (Cherry, Nicolas)
May 31, 2022 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BW/IP, INC..(O'Neill, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BW/IP, INC..(O'Neill, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of BW/IP, INC. (O'Neill, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 31 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William Henry Kleindienst on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Kleindienst, William)
May 31, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Velan Valve Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Rawl, A)
May 31, 2022 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IMO Industries, Inc..(Collins, William)
May 31, 2022 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by IMO Industries, Inc..(Collins, William)
May 31, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Collins, William)
May 27, 2022 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blackmer Pump Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anchor Darling Valve Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blackmer Pump Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Anchor Darling Valve Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Crane Inc..(Elliott, James)
May 27, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Crane Inc..(Elliott, James)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co..(Sullivan, Tara)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co..(Sullivan, Tara)
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre Shelton McCool on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (McCool, Deirdre)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Glenn on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Glenn, James)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by G Mark Phillips on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Phillips, G)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Meriwether, Robert)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dane Berthelsen on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Berthelsen, Cameron)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Elliott, James)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (adic, )
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alexander Sink. (adic, )
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10458781.), filed by Alexander Sink. Service due by 7/25/2022. (adic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sink v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Darling Valve Company
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Jackson Pump Company
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: William Ansel Collins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: William Henry Kleindienst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co. Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sink
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Represented By: Tyler B Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?