City of Portsmouth v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Portsmouth
Defendant: 3M Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC, DuPont De Nemours Inc., Corteva, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc, Johnson Controls International plc, Central Sprinkler LLC, Fire Products GP Holding LLC, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Kidde PLC Inc, Chubb Fire LTD, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, National Foam Inc, Angus International Safety Group LTD, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Dynax Corporation, Clariant Corporation, Chemicals Incorporated, Nation Ford Chemical Company, AGC Inc, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc and John Doe 1-49
Case Number: 2:2022cv01441
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, AGC Inc, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemicals Incorporated, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, John Doe 1-49, DuPont De Nemours Inc., Dynax Corporation, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc. (sshe, )
May 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Portsmouth of Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Central Sprinkler, LLC, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, and Johnson Controls International, plc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
May 6, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
May 6, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Cossich, Philip)
May 6, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Cossich, Christina)
May 6, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Smith, Luana)
May 5, 2022 Filing 16 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern, 1:22-cv-00220, City of Portsmouth v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1441-RMG. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 24, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4, 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 6.E, 10.A, 11.A, 11.B, 12.A, 13.A, 15.A, 16.A, 16.B, 16.C, 16.D, 18.A, 19.A, 19.B, 19-C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case and on the Court's MDL website. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE / NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2022 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel (call-in instructions will be circulated the week of prior to each telephonic status conference). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
May 5, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00220. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 88) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel (pb) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting re #12 Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff City of Portsmouth's Complaint. Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP shall have up to and including 28 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters its decision on whether to transfer to the Multi-District Litigation to answer, move, or otherwise plead. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 5/3/22. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff City of Portsmouth's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1) (Rhinehart, Erin) Modified event type on 5/2/2022 (kl). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/27/2022. (kkz) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP re #8 Notice (Other) of Removal Papers Filed with Scioto County Common Pleas Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1) (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #8 Notice (Other) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #8 Notice (Other) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/27/2022. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP of Removal Papers Filed with the Scioto County Common Pleas Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Judge Matthew W. McFarland no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/26/2022. (kaf) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Chemguard, Inc.. (Casey, Raika) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, originally filed on 3/22/2022 in Scioto County Common Pleas Court (Case No. 22CIH00056), by City of Portsmouth. (kh) Modified docket text to add case number on 4/25/2022 (kh). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. (Casey, Raika) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Raika Nicole Casey for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Casey, Raika) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scioto County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22CIH00056 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8836312), filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Summons) (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
April 25, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Portsmouth v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Portsmouth
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Zachary C Schaengold
Represented By: Brandon J Taylor
Represented By: Christina Cossich
Represented By: Luana N Smith
Represented By: Philip F Cossich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Raika Nicole Casey
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Raika Nicole Casey
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Sprinkler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?