Regal West Corporation v. Neeves
Plaintiff: Regal West Corporation
Defendant: Garry Neeves
Case Number: 2:2022cv01653
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Filing 17 Supplemental MOTION to Stay re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Supporting Memorandum by Garry Neeves. Response to Motion due by 8/4/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Crites, J)
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gedney M Howe, IV on behalf of Garry Neeves (Howe, Gedney)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Supporting Memorandum by Garry Neeves. Response to Motion due by 8/3/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Crites, J)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gedney M Howe, III on behalf of Garry Neeves (Howe, Gedney)
July 13, 2022 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Garry Neeves.(Crites, J)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Garry Neeves.(Crites, J)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Paul M. Schoenhard to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Regal West Corporation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 06/29/2022.(hcor, )
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Nicole M. Jantzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Regal West Corporation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 06/29/2022.(hcor, )
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jason S. Kanterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Regal West Corporation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 06/29/2022.(hcor, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole M. Jantzi ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10564256) by Regal West Corporation. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application-Affidavit Pro Hac Jantz, #2 Proposed Order proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hood, Robert)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason S. Kanterman ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10564234) by Regal West Corporation. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application-Affidavit Pro Hac Kanterman, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hood, Robert)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Schoenhard ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10564116) by Regal West Corporation. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application-Affidavit Pro Hac Schoenhard, #2 Proposed Order proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hood, Robert)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Regal West Corporation. Garry Neeves served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(Hood, Robert)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Garry Neeves. (hcor, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Regal West Corporation.(hcor, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garry Neeves ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10510478.), filed by Regal West Corporation. Service due by 8/23/2022(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regal West Corporation v. Neeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regal West Corporation
Represented By: Robert H Hood, Jr
Represented By: Jason S Kanterman
Represented By: Nicole M Jantzi
Represented By: Paul M Schoenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Neeves
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, IV
Represented By: J Bennett Crites, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?