County of Dane v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: County of Dane
Defendant: 3M Company, AGC Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Angus International Safety Group LTD, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Central Sprinkler LLC, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemicals Incorporated, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Fire Products GP Holding LLC, Johnson Controls International plc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Asahi Glass Co Ltd, United Technologies Corporation and John Doe 1-49
Case Number: 2:2022cv01791
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Fortunato on behalf of County of Dane Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01791-RMG(Fortunato, Jody)
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of County of Dane Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01791-RMG(Cossich, Philip)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of County of Dane Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01791-RMG(Cossich, Christina)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of County of Dane Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01791-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of County of Dane Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01791-RMG(Smith, Luana)
June 8, 2022 Filing 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wisconsin Western, 3:22-cv-00292, County of Dane v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1791-RMG (sshe, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-00292. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #4 Stipulation to Extend Time, extension granted in the manner requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/24/2022. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Byam-Katzman, Jesse) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. (Byam-Katzman, Jesse) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Chemguard, Inc.. (Byam-Katzman, Jesse) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 2022-cv-000997. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3062702), filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and Notice of Appearance, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Byam-Katzman, Jesse) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/8/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Dane v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel Leslie Ring
Represented By: Tyler D Alfermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Inc
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Laura Offenbacher Aradi
Represented By: Peter C Condron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Daniel Leslie Ring
Represented By: Tyler D Alfermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Laura Offenbacher Aradi
Represented By: Peter C Condron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group LTD
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management LLC
Represented By: Charles E Raynal, IV
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma US Inc
Represented By: Charles E Raynal, IV
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc
Represented By: Heidi Lynn Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: John R Wellschlager
Represented By: Matthew A Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Michael L Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Sprinkler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Inc
Represented By: Jonathan B Blakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Jesse Lee Byam-Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Represented By: John F Parker
Represented By: Oliver E Twaddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire LTD
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Represented By: Charles E Raynal, IV
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Represented By: Kurt D Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Represented By: Addie K S Ries
Represented By: Clifton L Brinson
Represented By: Kirk G Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Represented By: Ethan Robert Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC LLC
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Jesse Lee Byam-Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asahi Glass Co Ltd
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Laura Offenbacher Aradi
Represented By: Peter C Condron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Keith Harris Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Dane
Represented By: Amy Tutwiler
Represented By: Brandon J Taylor
Represented By: Christina Cossich
Represented By: Jody Fortunato
Represented By: Luana N Smith
Represented By: Philip F Cossich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?