Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Hallmark Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Hallmark Construction, LLC, Prestige Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. and H. R. Allen, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01796
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffrey M. Zielinski who represents the plaintiff is grantedadmission pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/19/2022. (adic, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Thaddeus S. Kirk who represents the plaintiff is granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/19/2022. (adic, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Zielinski ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10597728) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Jeffrey M. Zielinski, #2 Supporting Documents Certificates of Good Standing - Jeffrey M. Zielinski, #3 Proposed Order Jeffrey M. Zielinski)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ogburn, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thaddeus S. Kirk ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10597678) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Thaddeus S. Kirk, #2 Supporting Documents Certificates of Good Standing - Thaddeus S. Kirk, #3 Proposed Order - Thaddeus S. Kirk)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ogburn, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by H. R. Allen, Inc..(Bevans, Shawn)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 12/30/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/6/2022. (adic, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/27/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 8/10/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/30/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/31/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/31/2022, Discovery due by 12/30/2022, Motions due by 1/30/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 5/1/2023, Mediation Due by 12/30/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/6/2022. (adic, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by H. R. Allen, Inc..(Bevans, Shawn)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hallmark Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Varnado, Robert)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Prestige Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc..(Cobb, David)
July 5, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prestige Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc..(Cobb, David)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to H. R. Allen, Inc. (adic, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prestige Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. (adic, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hallmark Construction, LLC. (adic, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (adic, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 10530787.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Service due by 9/6/2022 (adic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Hallmark Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lynn Ogburn, III
Represented By: Jeffrey M Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus S Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert Bratton Varnado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc.
Represented By: David Starr Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. R. Allen, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Michael Bevans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?