Orange County Water District et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Orange County Water District, City of Anaheim, East Orange County Water District, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, Irvine Ranch Water District, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, Serrano Water District, City of Tustin and Yorba Linda Water District
Defendant: 3M Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. and Doe Defendants
Case Number: 2:2022cv01798
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley B Campbell on behalf of City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District (Campbell, Ashley) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01798-RMG Refiled in management case, and spread to applicable member case as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions per CMO No 1.(sshe, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 68 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Central, 8:21-cv-01029, Orange County Water District et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1798-RMG (sshe, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 66 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:21-cv-01029. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2022 Filing 65 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2873, transferring case to USDC, District of South Carolina, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML DECISION ON TRANSFER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having read and considered the parties' Stipulation #63 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is stayed pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's disposition of the Defendants' unopposed renewed motion to transfer this action to the In re AFFF Products Liability Litigation Multidistrict Litigation (No. 2:18-mn-02873 (D.S.C.)). This stay shall be a stay for all purposes. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
March 24, 2022 Filing 63 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending JPML Decision on Transfer filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
March 24, 2022 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 61 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #52 , CCA # 21-55778. The judgment of this Court, entered March 01, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #59 , REVERSED AND REMANDED](mat) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Within 14 days of this order, the parties shall submit a joint report how the case should proceed, in light of the Memorandum from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals #59 , and whether the parties will file a renewed motion to the MDL. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
March 1, 2022 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #52 filed by 3M Company. CCA # 21-55778. The district court shall resolve this issue on remand. REVERSED AND REMANDED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 57 [Notice of Clerical Error filed 9/16/21 item 58.] ORDER ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND MOTION TO DISMISS from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #52 filed by 3M Company. CCA # 20-55267, 21-55757. Appellants' motions to consolidate Appeal Nos. 20-55267 (preliminary injunction) and 21-55757 (Second Amended Complaint) are granted in part. We consolidate Appeal Nos. 20-55267 and 21-55757. However, we deny Appellants' request to limit briefing, given the new factual and procedural developments in the case. [See document for more details.] (mat) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #52 filed by 3M Company. CCA # 21-55778. The motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. The alternative request for summary affirmance is denied. Appellant's motion to stay the district courts remand order is denied. Appellant's alternative request to expedite the appeal is granted. This case will be placed on the next available calendar. [See document for more complete details.](mat) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 55 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 53 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55778 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #52 as to defendant 3M Company. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DEEMING MOTION MOOT (MDL No. 2873) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant 3M Company. Appeal of Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #46 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31679501.) (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 50 Opposition In Opposition To re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending APPEAL Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #46 48 filed by Plaintiff Orange County Water District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel S. Robinson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Sansone, Kenneth) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT 3M Company, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending APPEAL Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #46 48 served on JULY 20, 2021. (Boer, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 47 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING #39 MOTION TO REMAND #39 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. The case is remanded to Orange County Superior Court. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)[Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #44 served on July 12, 2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #39 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tom Boer)(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Kevin Kim, #3 Proposed Order) (Kim, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., identifying Decra Holdings LLC. (Kim, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Keevin Kim counsel for Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. Adding Kevin K. Kim as counsel of record for Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. (Attorney Kevin Keevin Kim added to party Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Robinson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #39 filed by Plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District. Motion set for hearing on 8/2/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, of New Case Order #35 served on June 30, 2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 37 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (FRCP Rule 12(b)(2)) #19 , and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(2) #22 - The hearing on the motions previously scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:30 a.m. has been rescheduled to 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by plaintiffs #14 - The ex parte application #14 is DENIED for failure to present a proper basis for emergency relief. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a properly noticed motion. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-08897-SVW-(ASx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01029-SVW-(ASx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (dve) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Jury Demand #32 - (AMENDED) - served on 06/28/2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 32 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant 3M Company.. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, identifying Corteva, Inc.. (Rapp, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Chemours Company, (Rapp, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District, (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Remand #14 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. However, counsel must consult the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #16 and file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than **June 24, 2021.** Failure to do so may result in the Application being STRICKEN. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, - (Second Amended Complaint) - filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 26 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District.. (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #18 re Ex Parte Application to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 served on June 17, 2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DECRA ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant DECRA Roofing Systems, Inc. shall have until July 9, 2021 to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., identifying DuPont de Nemours, Inc. and Corteva, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 22 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(2) filed by Defendants Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Dana Eddis, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Peter W. Hennessey, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Corteva, Inc. and DuPont de Nemours, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(2)) (Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Corteva, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party DuPont De Nemours, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Murphy, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 7.1 filed by Defendant The Chemours Company (Mortl, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 7.1 filed by Defendant E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company identifying Corteva, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Mortl, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 19 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (FRCP Rule 12(b)(2)) filed by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and the Chemours Company's Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (FRCP Rule 12(b)(2)), #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion of Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and the Chemours Company's Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (FRCP Rule 12(b)(2))) (Attorney Andrew T. Mortl added to party E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew T. Mortl added to party The Chemours Company(pty:dft)) (Mortl, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Decision: Action Not Appropriate for Inclusion in MDL filed by Plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Robinson in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 filed by Plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by plaintiffs City of Anaheim, City of Fullerton, City of Garden Grove, City of Orange, City of Santa Ana, City of Tustin, East Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, Yorba Linda Water District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT in Opposition to Defendant 3M Co.'s Notice of Related Cases re: Notice of Related Case(s) #4 . (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 7/9/2021 #11 served on 06/15/2021. (Le, Irene) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 7/9/2021 filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Irene Le added to party Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Le, Irene) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, served on June 15, 2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Declaration,,,, #2 served on June 11, 2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant 3M Company. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-08897-SVW-AS (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Daniel Queen re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Queen Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Queen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Queen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4, Part 1, to Queen Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4, Part 2, to Queen Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4, Part 3, to Queen Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4, Part 4, to Queen Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4, Part 5, to Queen Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4, Part 6, to Queen Declaration, #10 Exhibit 5 to Queen Declaration, #11 Exhibit 6 to Queen Declaration, #12 Exhibit 7 to Queen Declaration, #13 Exhibit 8 to Queen Declaration, #14 Exhibit 9 to Queen Declaration, #15 Exhibit 10 to Queen Declaration, #16 Exhibit 11 to Queen Declaration, #17 Exhibit 12 to Queen Declaration, #18 Exhibit 13 to Queen Declaration, #19 Exhibit 14 to Queen Declaration, #20 Exhibit 15 to Queen Declaration, #21 Exhibit 16 to Queen Declaration, #22 Exhibit 17 to Queen Declaration)(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01172419-CU-PL-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-31449301 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attorney Daniel David Queen added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, Corteva, Inc., Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., Doe Defendants, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove. (filed in state court 12/1/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/15/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 2) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove, upon Defendant The Chemours Company served on 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/15/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 4, p. 105) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove, upon Defendant E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company served on 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/15/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 4, p. 116) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, Corteva, Inc., Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., Doe Defendants, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, filed by plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove (filed in state court 2/3/21, submitted as document 2, attachment 5)(esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove, upon Defendant DuPont De Nemours, Inc. served on 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Agent for service of process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/15/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 4, p. 111) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove, upon Defendant Corteva, Inc. served on 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/15/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 4, p. 107) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove, upon Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. served on 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/2/20, submitted as document 2, attachment 4, p. 87) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]
June 11, 2021 COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, Corteva, Inc., Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., Doe Defendants, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, filed by plaintiffs Yorba Linda Water District, City of Orange, City of Anaheim, Orange County Water District, Irvine Ranch Water District, East Orange County Water District, Serrano Water District, City of Santa Ana, City of Fullerton, City of Tustin, City of Garden Grove (non-conformed, submitted as document 2, attachment 3)(esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/8/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange County Water District et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orange County Water District
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Anaheim
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Orange County Water District
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fullerton
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Garden Grove
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvine Ranch Water District
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Orange
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Santa Ana
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serrano Water District
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Tustin
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yorba Linda Water District
Represented By: Alexander I Leff
Represented By: Andrew W Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Ashley B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Thomas J Boer
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Represented By: Andrew T. Mortl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Represented By: Andrew T. Mortl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: Jodi M Newberry
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Represented By: Jodi M Newberry
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Irene Le
Represented By: Kevin Keevin Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?