GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC v. BECERRA
Plaintiff: GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 2:2022cv03932
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/9/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/13/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 2/13/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/10/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/17/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2023, Discovery due by 9/11/2023, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 10/16/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 11/1/2023, Mediation Due by 10/31/2023. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/05/2022. (hcor, )
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Mary Yates on behalf of GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC (Yates, Melissa)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by XAVIER BECERRA.(Prince, Marshall)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-02486. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's #10 Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including 21 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 19, 2022. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
October 15, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of South Carolina by XAVIER BECERRA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
October 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA (Dreier, Douglas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/7/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/6/2022. (Bittinger, Stephen) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/30/2022. (Bittinger, Stephen) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 8/26/2022 (Bittinger, Stephen) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 25, 2022. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmrl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC (Bittinger, Stephen) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC. Case related to Case No. 22-2304. (Bittinger, Stephen) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9455967) filed by GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Graves, #4 Summons to Garland, #5 Summons to Becerra)(Bittinger, Stephen) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/8/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC v. BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOSE CREEK PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC
Represented By: Stephen D Bittinger
Represented By: Melissa Mary Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Douglas C. Dreier
Represented By: Marshall Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?