Hansen-Mueller Co. v. M/V Salamina 1 et al
Plaintiff: Hansen-Mueller Co.
Defendant: M/V Salamina 1, Baupres Shipping LDA and Navesco SA
Not Classified By Court: James D. Lucas Co., LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02058
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hansen-Mueller Co. (Bluestein, S)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Release of Vessel Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/17/2023. (hcor, )
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Publication. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/16/2023.(hcor, )
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Allow Vessel to Move Within Port and to Continue Cargo Operations. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/16/2023.(hcor, )
May 16, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Publication by Hansen-Mueller Co.. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Newspaper Ad, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
May 16, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Allow Vessel to Move within Port and Continue Cargo Operations by Hansen-Mueller Co.. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appoint Custodian. James D. Lucas Co., LLC appointed. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/16/2023.(hcor, )
May 16, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Hansen-Mueller Co.. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Statement of Substitute Custodian, #2 Supporting Documents Substitute Custodian fee sheet)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (hcor, )
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/16/2023.(hcor, )
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Hansen-Mueller Co.. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Navesco SA. (hcor, )
May 15, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baupres Shipping LDA. (hcor, )
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hansen-Mueller Co..(hcor, )
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baupres Shipping LDA, M/V Salamina 1, Navesco SA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11100222.), filed by Hansen-Mueller Co.. Service due by 8/14/2023(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen-Mueller Co. v. M/V Salamina 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansen-Mueller Co.
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Salamina 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baupres Shipping LDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navesco SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: James D. Lucas Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?