City of Camden et al v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: City of Camden, City of Brockton, City of Sioux Falls, California Water Service Company, City of Delray Beach, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Township of Verona, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, City of South Shore, City of Freeport, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Seaman Cottages, Village of Bridgeport, City of Benwood, Niagara County, City of Pineville, City of Iuka and City Of Philadelphia
Defendant: 3M Company
Interested Party: State of Colorado, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin, The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, District of Columbia, Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc., Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Guam, State of New Hampshire, State of North Carolina, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board, State of Ohio, State of Arizona, State of Connecticut, Lakewood Water District, Moses Lake, City of, Airway Heights, City of, DuPont, City of, Newburgh, City of, Security Water District and Town of New Windsor
Case Number: 2:2023cv03147
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Sovereign Letter (Arizona, California, Pennsylvania, Wisconsin and the District of Columbia) Response filed by The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/5/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Hughes, Brendan)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with 3M Company (Addressing Roosevelt County Water Coop., Inc.) Response filed by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(London, Michael)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended MSA, #2 Exhibit Amended Notice, #3 Exhibit Amended Notice Plan, #4 Exhibit Amended Summary Notice, #5 Exhibit Amended Phase One Eligible Claimants, #6 Exhibit Amended Phase Two Eligible Claimants, #7 Exhibit Amended Systems Owned by State Government, #8 Exhibit Amended Systems Owned by Fed Government, #9 Exhibit Amended Potential Eligible Plaintiff Claimants, #10 Exhibit Amended Payment Schedule, #11 Exhibit Amended Letter from Releasing Party, #12 Exhibit Amended Proposed Preliminary Approval Order)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(London, Michael)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (3462 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, by Mark A Chertok on behalf of Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Chertok, Mark)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ORDER granting (3552) Motion for Extension of Time to August 28th to file reply to motion for preliminary approval of settlement and opposition to the Sovereigns' motion to intervene re (3552 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 56 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 8/16/23.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(cper, )
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) (Plaintiffs' and 3M's Third Joint Motion for Extension of Time) by 3M Company. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Ring, Daniel)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER This Order relates to: City of Camden, et al., v. 3M Company, No. 2:23-cv-03147-RMG. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' and 3M's Second Joint Motion ( 3529 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 51 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' and 3M's deadlines to respond to the Motion to Intervene and reply to the Opposition Filings is extended to August 16, 2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/9/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, )
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (37 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3462 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion by Jeff B Kray on behalf of Airway Heights, City of, Lakewood Water District, Moses Lake, City of, Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc., DuPont, City of, Newburgh, City of, Security Water District, Town of New Windsor Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Kray, Jeff) QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Clerk refiled to correct event type (not a Motion) as of original filing date(sshe, ) Modified to original document number on 8/9/2023 (sshe, ).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Support re (3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) Response filed by Plaintiffs City of Airway Heights, City of DuPont, City of Moses Lake, City of Newburgh, Lakewood Water District, Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc., Security Water District, and Town of New Windsor (collectively, Undersigned Plaintiffs). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Kray, Jeff) Modified on 8/9/2023 to edit docket text as to "filed by Plaintiffs"(sshe, ).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) (Plaintiffs' and 3M's Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time) by 3M Company. Response to Motion due by 8/22/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Ring, Daniel)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (3465 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,, (37 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3462 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (3464 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 38 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) Supplement,,, Joinder of City of Philadelphia to Sovereigns Omnibus Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, For Certification of Settlement Class, and For Permission to Disseminate Class Notice by Aimee D Thomson on behalf of City Of Philadelphia Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Thomson, Aimee)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER This Document relates to: City of Camden, et al., v. 3M Company, No. 2:23-cv-03147-RMG. Plaintiffs' and 3M's Motion 3492 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (46) in case 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) that they each be permitted to file one memorandum in reply to the Opposition Filings, not to exceed 35 pages in length, is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/1/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, )
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER This Order relates to: City of Camden, et al., v. 3M Company, No. 2:23-cv-03147-RMG. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' and 3M's Motion ( 3491 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 45 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. The time to Respond to the Motion to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) re (3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) and Reply to the Opposition Filings re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) is extended to August 9, 2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/1/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, )
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with 3M Company (Addressing Roosevelt County Water Coop., Inc.) Response filed by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02612-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(London, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Plaintiffs' and 3M's Joint Motion for Additional Pages) by 3M Company, 3M Company. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Ring, Daniel)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) (Plaintiffs' and 3M's Joint Motion for Extension of Time) by 3M Company. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Ring, Daniel)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E Shannon on behalf of City of Iuka, City of Pineville, Niagara County Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Shannon, Megan)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jenkins on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Jenkins, William)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER re (3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) filed by The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California. The time in which to file a Response to Motion is shortened to 8/2/2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/27/2023. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, )
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (37 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (38 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) Supplement,,, Joinder to States' and Sovereigns' Omnibus Opposition and Subset of Sovereigns' Supplemental Opposition by Annadel Angeline Almendras on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Exh 1 States' and Sovereigns' Onmibus Opposition, #2 Supporting Documents Exh 2 Subset of Sovereigns' Supplemental Opposition, #3 Supporting Documents Exh 3 Declaration of Sarae Snyder, #4 Supporting Documents Exh 4 Declaration of Andrew Altevogt, #5 Supporting Documents Exh 5 Declaration of David Lewis)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Almendras, Annadel)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement - Supplemental Memorandum of Law by States of Maine and Vermont in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Response filed by State of Maine, State of Vermont.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/2/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - July 14, 2023 Status Conf. Tr.)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Pawa, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2023 to add description to exhibit(sshe, ).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California to (37 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3462 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, [Subset of Sovereigns' Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, For Certification of Settlement Class and For Permission to Disseminate Class Notice]. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Decl. of Nicholas Campins, #2 Supporting Documents Decl. of Christopher Stevens, #3 Supporting Documents Decl. of Andrew Altevogt, #4 Supporting Documents Evid. Objection to T. Rabb Decl., #5 Supporting Documents Evid. Objection to R. Hesse Decl., #6 Supporting Documents Evid. Objection to P. Chavan Decl.)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Campins, Nicholas)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement [States' and Sovereigns' Omnibus Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, for Certification of Settlement Class and for Permission to Disseminate Class Notice] Response filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Ohio, State of Arizona, State of Connecticut.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/2/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of City of Long Beach v. Monsanto, No. 2:16-cv-03493, ECF No. 254 (C.D. Cal.), #2 Exhibit 2 - July 14, 2023 Status Conf. Tr.)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Jackson, William) Modified on 7/27/2023 to reference 3464 Supplement (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, #38 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) filed 7/26/2023(sshe, ). Modified on 7/28/2023 to add descriptions to exhibits(sshe, ).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Additional Attachments to Main Document (35 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3460 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene). First attachment description: Exhibit 1 - District of Columbia - Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Maine Complaint, #2 Exhibit 3 - Maryland - AFFF Complaint, #3 Exhibit 4 - Maryland - Statewide Complaint, #4 Exhibit 5 - New Hampshire - Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 6 - New Mexico - Complaint, #6 Exhibit 7 - Pennsylvania - Complaint, #7 Exhibit 8 - Vermont - Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 9 - Vermont - Stipulation)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Campins, Nicholas) Modified on 7/27/2023 to add descriptions to exhibits(sshe, ).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene (Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene) by The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of the Sovereigns' Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Campins, Nicholas) Modified on 7/27/2023 to reference 3461 Additional Attachments (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, #36 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) filed 7/26/2023(sshe, ).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 30, 31, 32 Reason: duplicate corrections; attorney filing user corrected member case number on appearance documents and spread to corrected applicable member case Corrected Filing Document Numbers #27 , #28 , #29 Filing dates are as of original filing: 7/25/2023 (sshe, )
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarae Snyder on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Snyder, Sarae)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Muriel Smith on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Smith, Janelle)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Annadel Angeline Almendras on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Almendras, Annadel)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER This Document relates to City of Camden, et al. v. 3M Company, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG. For good cause shown, the motion to extend the time to respond to certain Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement between public water systems and 3M Company from July 24, 2023 to July 26, 2023 (Dkt. No. 3436 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (24) in case 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) is GRANTED and the States' objections, if any, must be filed on or before July 26, 2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/25/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, )
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Response filed by Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/31/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Rodriguez, Christopher) Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to additional applicable member case(s), to which the document relates, as listed/corrected by clerk on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: PLEASE note correct filing procedures for future filings. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02612-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, ) Modified to original lead document number on 7/25/2023 (sshe, ).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Allow Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport, Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(London, Michael)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF JOINDER in Motion for Extension of Time (3405 in 18mn2873, 5 in 23cv3147) by William J Jackson on behalf of Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Guam, State of New Hampshire, State of North Carolina Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Jackson, William)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re (6 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3408 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, by Ann R Johnston on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Johnston, Ann) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG Refiled to correct event type per Motion for Joinder event type filed in error (per Motions Practice per CMO Nos. 2 and 2.A, per chambers), and refiled by clerk correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case(s) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: please note correct filing procedures for future filings.(sshe, ) Modified to original lead document number on 7/21/2023 (sshe, ).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Response filed by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02612-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(London, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2023 to correct event type relief description (remove Reply to Response due)(sshe, ).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Response filed by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:21-cv-00862-RMG, 2:21-cv-01915-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(London, Michael)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Preliminary RESPONSE in Opposition Joinder in Motion for Extension and, in the Alternative, Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement Response filed by Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/25/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02612-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Rodriguez, Christopher) Refiled to correct event type and correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case(s) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: please note correct filing procedures for future filings.(sshe, )
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG (deleted from 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:21-cv-00862-RMG, 2:21-cv-01915-RMG) (London, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2023 to reference document entry removed from 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:21-cv-00862-RMG, 2:21-cv-01915-RMG, per attorney filing user request (inadvertently spread in error to those member cases)(sshe, ).
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7 Reason: Notice of Joinder filed in error Corrected Filing Document Number 3418 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG), #13 (in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) Filing date is that of original filing: 7/17/2023 (sshe, )
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (6 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3408 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Nicholas George Campins on behalf of The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Campins, Nicholas)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case(s) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: please note correct filing procedures for future filings.(sshe, )
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) to proposed 3M Settlement Response filed by Town of Islip, New York, Town of Harrietstown, New York, Town of East Hampton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/24/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 14, 2023 Hearing Transcript)(Rigano, Nicholas)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:21-cv-00862-RMG, 2:21-cv-01915-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG Clerk refiled as of original filing date to spread to applicable member case per reference link re Motion 3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, ) Modified original document number on 7/18/2023 (sshe, ).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Sealed Document in re document (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG).(London, Michael) Modified link 3370, reference link: 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG on 7/18/2023 (sshe, ). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG Refiled as of original filing date to spread to correct applicable member case and Modified for original lead document number on 7/18/2023 (sshe, ).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from City of Airway Heights, City of Moses Lake, and Lakewood Water District, Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Water Supplier Committee Letters and Co-Lead Counsel Responses)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Kray, Jeff)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (6 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 3408 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, Notice of Joinder Motion for Extension of Time for the States to Respond to Certain Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Public Water Systems and 3M Company by Jimmy Rock on behalf of The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, District of Columbia Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Rock, Jimmy)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER This Document relates to City of Camden, et al. v. 3M Company, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG. The States' motion 3405 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 5 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) is GRANTED IN PART and the States' objections, if any, re MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Dkt. No. 3370 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG), must be filed on or before July 24, 2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/17/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, ) Modified link 3370 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, reference link: 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) on 7/18/2023 (sshe, ).
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (3370 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG)(reference link: 10 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) by State of Colorado, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. Response to Motion due by 7/28/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(Jackson, William) Modified link on 7/18/2023 (sshe, ).
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed on 6/30/2023) (associated as of 7/12/2023), City of Camden et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03147-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: South Carolina (sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11187194.), filed by City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, City of Benwood, City of Delray Beach, City of Camden, California Water Service Company, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, City of Iuka, Township of Verona, Niagara County, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Village of Bridgeport, City of Freeport, Seaman Cottages, City of Brockton. Service due by 10/10/2023(sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER This Document relates to 2:23-cv-03147-RMG. After a careful review of the complaint, the motion for leave to direct file complaint (Dkt. No. 3367 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/12/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG(sshe, )
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) by Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Approval Order, #3 Exhibit 2- MSA and Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 3-Summy Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4- London Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5- Napoli Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6- Phillips Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7- Fegan Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8- Angeion Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9- Mire Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10- Garretson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11- Hesse Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12- Raab Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13- Trapp Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14- Chavan Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15- Mitzel Declaration)No proposed order.(London, Michael) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG Refiled to spread to applicable member case, per chambers (note: clerk modified subsequent filings to link correct event to associated events) (sshe, ) Modified for original lead case document number on 7/18/2023 (sshe, ). (Entered: 07/18/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Camden et al v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Camden
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Brockton
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sioux Falls
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Water Service Company
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Delray Beach
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Township of Verona
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Shore
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Freeport
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinsburg Municipal Authority
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seaman Cottages
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Bridgeport
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Benwood
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niagara County
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pineville
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Iuka
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Philadelphia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel Leslie Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Colorado
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: Heather Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Hawaii
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Maine
Represented By: Matthew F Pawa
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Maryland
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Massachusetts
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Minnesota
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Gwen Farley
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of New Mexico
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Oregon
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Tennessee
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Texas
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Vermont
Represented By: Laura B Murphy
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: Bradley Motl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Represented By: Nicholas George Campins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jimmy Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: District of Columbia
Represented By: Jimmy Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Ann R Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: Keisha Blaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Guam
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Christopher G Aslin
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of North Carolina
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Annadel Angeline Almendras
Represented By: Janelle Muriel Smith
Represented By: Sarae Snyder
Represented By: William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California State Water Resources Control Board
Represented By: Janelle Muriel Smith
Represented By: Sarae Snyder
Represented By: William Jenkins
Represented By: Annadel Angeline Almendras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Ohio
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Arizona
Represented By: Curtis Andrew Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Connecticut
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lakewood Water District
Represented By: Jeff B Kray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Moses Lake, City of
Represented By: Jeff B Kray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Airway Heights, City of
Represented By: Jeff B Kray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DuPont, City of
Represented By: Jeff B Kray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Newburgh, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Security Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Town of New Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?