Seixas-Mikelus v. Tenet Healthcare Corporation et al
Petitioner: M.D. Stefanie Seixas-Mikelus
Respondent: Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources LLC and East Cooper Physician Network LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv03986
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support Response filed by East Cooper Physician Network LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/12/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-October 5, 2023 Supplemental Declaration of Warren Stowell)(Thomas, Carmen)
September 28, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 2023.05.26- Stacey Coe email w duly executed Award)Thomas, Carmen) Corrected event type on 10/2/2023 (gray).
September 28, 2023 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting in part #10 Respondents' motion to stay. After review, the Court, in its discretion, finds it appropriate to stay the scheduling order, discovery, and disclosures while the motion to remand is pending. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c); Local Civil Rule 16.00, D.S.C. Accordingly, the Court hereby grants in part Respondents' motion to stay. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/28/2023. (gray)
September 27, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order,, Response filed by East Cooper Physician Network LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources LLC. (Thomas, Carmen)
September 22, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response to #11 Motion to Remand due by 10/5/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 09/22/2023.(hcor, )
September 21, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by East Cooper Physician Network LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thomas, Carmen)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order,, Response filed by Stfanie Seixas-Mikelus.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/27/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Nicholson, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order. Response to Motion due by 9/20/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/12/2023. (gray)
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respondents' Motion for Protection from and to Stay Scheduling Order by Stfanie Seixas-Mikelus. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nicholson, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by Stfanie Seixas-Mikelus. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Seixas Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - PEA, #3 Exhibit C - Emails, #4 Exhibit D - Winney Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - Downes Deposition Excerpts)No proposed order.(Nicholson, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order,, by East Cooper Physician Network LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/20/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thomas, Carmen)
August 25, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by East Cooper Physician Network LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Fair Treatment Process, #2 Exhibit 2-Respondents' Answer to Petitioners Arbitration Demand, #3 Exhibit 3-July 23, 2021, AAA Ltr. to Parties and Kris Cato resume excerpted from list of candidates, #4 Exhibit 4-August 6, 2021, Email from E. Nicholson Email to C. Thomas, S. Harper, #5 Exhibit 5-August 16, 2021, Email from E. Nicholson to Mary Jara (AAA), C. Thomas, #6 Exhibit 6-September 1, 2021, Email from AAA to Parties, #7 Exhibit 7-September 14, 2021, Email from AAA to Parties, #8 Exhibit 8-S.C. Ethics Commission Lobbyist Disclosures)(Thomas, Carmen)
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stfanie Seixas-Mikelus.(Nicholson, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2023 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 2/12/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/16/2023. (gray) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/16/2023) (gray, ).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/6/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/20/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 9/20/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/11/2023, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 11/13/2023, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/13/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/13/2023, Discovery due by 2/12/2024, Motions due by 3/13/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 6/11/2024, Mediation Due by 2/12/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/16/2023. (gray) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/16/2023) (gray, ).
August 11, 2023 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tenet Physician Resources LLC. (gray)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tenet Healthcare Corporation. (gray)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by East Cooper Physician Network LLC. (gray)
August 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023CP1003391 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BSCDC-11261564), filed by Tenet Physician Resources LLC, East Cooper Physician Network LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Demand for Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit 3-Warren Stowell Declaration) (gray) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2023) (gray, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seixas-Mikelus v. Tenet Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: M.D. Stefanie Seixas-Mikelus
Represented By: Elizabeth Foy Nicholson
Represented By: George Trenholm Walker
Represented By: James A Bruorton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Aline Warner
Represented By: Carmen Harper Thomas
Represented By: Sue Erwin Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tenet Physician Resources LLC
Represented By: Carmen Harper Thomas
Represented By: Caroline Aline Warner
Represented By: Sue Erwin Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: East Cooper Physician Network LLC
Represented By: Caroline Aline Warner
Represented By: Carmen Harper Thomas
Represented By: Sue Erwin Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?