Fisher v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Glen L Fisher
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Morese-Tec LLC, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, AW Chesterton Company, Bayer Cropscience Inc, Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation, Gardner Denver Inc, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, The Carborundum Company, Allied-Signal Inc, John Crane Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC, ViacomCBS Inc, CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation), Viacom Inc (successor by merger to CBS Corporation a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crane Co, Union Carbide Corporation, Warren Pumps Inc and Uniroyal Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv04051
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(Shofner, Erin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
October 3, 2023 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
October 3, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Paramount Global.(Techman, Jennifer)
October 2, 2023 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Honeywell International Inc.(Burns, James)
October 2, 2023 Filing 36 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 30 Reason: Filed as Duplicate. (gray)
October 2, 2023 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
October 2, 2023 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 29, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Warren Pumps Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 29, 2023 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 29, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Gardner Denver Inc, Warren Pumps Inc (Cherry, Nicolas)
September 29, 2023 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Genuine Parts Company.(Stewart, Taylor)
September 29, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Genuine Parts Company.(Stewart, Taylor)
September 29, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Honeywell International Inc.(Burns, James)
September 29, 2023 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
September 29, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
September 29, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
September 29, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of FMC Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation (Frick, Scott)
September 29, 2023 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 29, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 29, 2023 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FMC Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 29, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of FMC Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation (Conner, William)
September 28, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Air and Liquid Systems Corporation.(Patterson, Matthew)
September 27, 2023 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Redco Corporation.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Redco Corporation.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 26, 2023 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
September 26, 2023 Filing 11 John Crane Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Interrogatories from Uniroyal Holding, Inc. by Uniroyal Inc.(Davis, Donald)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Uniroyal Inc.(Davis, Donald)
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Jay Davis, Jr on behalf of Uniroyal Inc (Davis, Donald)
September 25, 2023 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Wall, Mark)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/16/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/30/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/27/2023, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 1/23/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/22/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/29/2024, Discovery due by 3/25/2024, Motions due by 4/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/2024, Motions in Limine must be filed no sooner than fifteen (15) days and no later than ten (10) days prior to the date certain set for jury selection and trial, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/25/2023. (gray)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wall, Mark)
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (gray)
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Glen L Fisher.(gray)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11267092), filed by Glen L Fisher. Service due by 11/13/2023. (gray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James H Burns
Represented By: Michael P Stover
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morese-Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James H Burns
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Represented By: Michael P Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Taylor Joy Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Carborundum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Inc
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James H Burns
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Represented By: Michael P Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation)
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc (successor by merger to CBS Corporation a Pennsylvania Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps Inc
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen L Fisher
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, IV
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?