Mayers v. Shaw Industries
Plaintiff: Earnest M Mayers
Defendant: Shaw Industries
Case Number: 3:2009cv02635
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Joseph R McCrorey
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 62 Report and Recommendations; granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Shaw Industries. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 3/29/2012. (asni, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 9 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Shaw Industries, 20 Report and Recommendations and remanding this action to the magistrate judge. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/14/2010. (cbru, )
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's hostile work environment, retaliation and ADEA claims be granted, re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shaw Industries, Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph R McCrorey on November 23, 2010. (kbos)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayers v. Shaw Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest M Mayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?