Todd et al v. Ford Motor Co Inc
Plaintiff: Marvin J Todd and Carolyn Diane Todd
Defendant: Ford Motor Co Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv00787
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 01/17/2013.(bshr, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RELIEVING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF granting 75 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney W. Jonathan Harling filed by Carolyn Diane Todd, Marvin J Todd,; granting 73 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Shannon A. Davis filed by Carolyn Diane Todd, Marvin J Todd. Attorney Shannon Ashli Davis and William Jonathan Harling terminated. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/17/12. (mflo, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY The court has permitted Richard Briebart to withdraw as attorney of record for Marvin J. Todd and Carolyn Diane Todd in this action. The court will allow the client thirty (30) days withi n which to notify the court of the identity of the new attorney to represent the client in this case or, alternatively, of the client's desire to proceed with this litigation without an attorney. Attorney Richard Jerome Breibart terminated. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/13/12. (mflo, )
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER STAYING CASE, staying all case deadlines until a determination has been made as to who will represent the plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 06/06/2012. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd et al v. Ford Motor Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin J Todd
Represented By: Richard Jerome Breibart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Diane Todd
Represented By: Richard Jerome Breibart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?