South Carolina, State of v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corp America
Case Number: 3:2011cv00731
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER remanding the action to the Richland County Court of Common Pleas, Fifth Judicial Circuit of South Carolina. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 01/21/2014. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.(bshr, )
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 56 MOTION for Order Confirming Prior Order Staying Remand Pending Final Determination of Jurisdiction, further staying the case pending a decision by the United States Supreme Court on the petitions for certiorari. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 01/09/2013. (bshr, )
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay 42 ORDER granting Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/16/2011.(bshr, )
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Remand, remanding the action to the Richland County Court of Common Pleas. CLERK'S NOTICE: Attorney's are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/14/2011.(bshr, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER/LETTER requesting additional information regarding related cases brought by the attorney generals of eight states. Requested information due by 09/06/2011. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/23/2011. (bshr, )
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER granting 5 Motion for Entry of Consent Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 04/07/2011.(bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina, State of v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: Clyde Havird Jones, Jr
Represented By: Nathaniel Heyward Clarkson, III
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Thomas Travis Medlock
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Veronica Lashawn Harris
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Kirsten Elena Small
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corp America
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Veronica Lashawn Harris
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Kirsten Elena Small
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?