Mulligan v. Brushy Mountain Bee Farm Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jason Mulligan
Defendant: Brushy Mountain Bee Farm Inc and Dadant & Sons Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv02899
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; and notifying parties the case will go to trial during the court's September/October 2014 term of court. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 07/02/2014.(bshr, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Compel Discovery from Def. Dadant, directing the CEO, President, or person in charge of the affairs of Dadant & Sons, Inc. to conduct a diligent search of the company's records and ce rtify to the court by affidavit that such search has been conducted and that the documents in question are unable to be located, have been destroyed, or never existed. Said affidavit due within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 02/28/2014.(bshr, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER notifying parties that the plaintiff shall furnish the report required by FRCP 26(a)(2)(B) within 21 days from the date of this order, the defendants shall have 60 days from the date of the filing of plaintiff's report within which to designate any additional defense experts, and the defendants' designation must also be accompanied by the report. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/09/2013. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulligan v. Brushy Mountain Bee Farm Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mulligan
Represented By: Pamela R Mullis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brushy Mountain Bee Farm Inc
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dadant & Sons Inc
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: Benson Hall Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?