Bradacs et al v. Haley et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Katherine Bradacs and Tracie Goodwin
Defendant: Nimrata Randhawa Haley and Alan M Wilson
Case Number: 3:2013cv02351
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 63 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Chris Sevier. Document Returned: 57 Proper Form Order (asni, )
April 23, 2014 62 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 61 Order on Motion to Stay placed in U.S. Mail to Chris Sevier (asni, )
April 23, 2014 61 TEXT ORDER granting 56 Motion to Stay the cross-motions deadlines along with the other deadlines in this case. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/23/2014.(asni, )
April 23, 2014 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson re 56 MOTION to Stay re 54 Order on Motion to Stay,,,, Motion to Include Cross-Motions in Stay (Smith, James)
April 23, 2014 58 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 57 Proper Form Order placed in U.S. Mail to Chris Sevier (asni, )
April 23, 2014 57 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 5/19/2014. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/22/2014. (asni, )
April 22, 2014 56 MOTION to Stay re 54 Order on Motion to Stay,,,, Motion to Include Cross-Motions in Stay by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2014. No proposed order.(Smith, James)
April 22, 2014 55 MOTION to Intervene by Chris Sevier. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(asni, )
April 22, 2014 54 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Stay and Hold Cross-Motions Deadline in Abeyance 47 is granted in part and denied in part. The Motion to Stay is granted since the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit will hear arguments in the case of Bostic v. Rainey, 2: 13CV395, 2014 WL 561978 (E.D. Va. Feb. 13, 2014) on May 13, 2014 ( a same-sex marriage case in Virginia). The stay is in effect until the Fourth Circuit issues its final opinion. Additionally, the parties consented to extend the cross motions deadline for dispositive issues until May 2, 2014, with responses to these motions due three weeks after the dates the respective motions are filed, and replies to these motions due two weeks after the respective responses are filed. Therefore, the briefing in this case will not be completed until June 6, 2014, approximately three weeks after the Fourth Circuit hears oral argument in the Bostic v. Rainey case. Based on the parties' consent to extend the cross-motions deadline, Defendants' Motion to Hold Cross-Motions Deadline in Abeyance is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/22/2014.(asni, )
April 17, 2014 52 TEXT ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time Entered by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/17/14.(jada, )
April 16, 2014 51 MOTION for Extension of Time with consent by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson, Katherine Bradacs and Tracie Goodwin. Response to Motion due by 5/5/2014. No proposed order.(Smith, James) Modified on 4/17/2014 to add parties(jada, ).
April 4, 2014 49 TEXT ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions due April 25, 2014. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/4/2014.(asni, )
April 3, 2014 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Dispositvie Motions by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson, Tracie Goodwin, Katherine Bradacs. Response to Motion due by 4/21/2014. No proposed order.(Smith, James)
April 3, 2014 47 MOTION to Stay and Hold Cross-Motions Deadline in Abeyance by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson. Response to Motion due by 4/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum Copy of Bostic v. Rainey decision)No proposed order.(Smith, James)
March 14, 2014 45 ANSWER to 41 Amended Complaint by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson.(Smith, James)
February 21, 2014 42 TEXT ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due March 18, 2014, cross-motions due April 11, 2014. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/21/2014.(asni, )
February 21, 2014 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson, filed by Tracie Goodwin, Katherine Bradacs. Service due by 6/26/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marriage Certificate) (Nichols, John)
February 20, 2014 40 MOTION for Extension of Time by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson. Response to Motion due by 3/10/2014. No proposed order.(Smith, James)
February 18, 2014 39 TEXT ORDER granting 37 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, with Defendant's consent 38 and ability to file all claims and defenses. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/18/2014.(asni, )
February 10, 2014 38 RESPONSE to Motion re 37 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, Response filed by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/21/2014 (Smith, James)
January 23, 2014 37 First MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by Katherine Bradacs, Tracie Goodwin. Response to Motion due by 2/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Warner, Carrie). Modified on 1/23/2014 to replace amended complaint with corrected version per the request of the filing user(bshr, ).
January 22, 2014 35 TEXT ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions due March 5, 2014. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/22/2014.(asni, )
January 21, 2014 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson, Tracie Goodwin, Katherine Bradacs. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2014. No proposed order.(Smith, James)
November 26, 2013 31 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery requests due by 12/6/2013, Responses to discovery due by 1/7/2014, Motions due by 2/3/2014, Responses to motions due three weeks after the dates the respective motions are filed, replies to responses to motions due two weeks after the respective responses are filed. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/26/2013. (asni, )
November 26, 2013 30 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by John Shannon Nichols for 1/15/14, 1/23-24/14 (Nichols, John)
November 14, 2013 29 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson.(Smith, James)
November 12, 2013 28 TEXT ORDER granting 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/12/2013.(asni, )
November 11, 2013 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura W. Morgan ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5031051) by Katherine Bradacs, Tracie Goodwin. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nichols, John)
October 18, 2013 26 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
October 8, 2013 24 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/8/2013. Counsel informs the court there will be very little discovery needed. Counsel are to submit proposed scheduling order 7 days after defendant files a responsive pleading. Court Reporter Daniel Mayo. (mflo, )
October 4, 2013 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/8/2013 03:00 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, )
October 4, 2013 22 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr. Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (mflo,)
October 3, 2013 21 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
October 3, 2013 20 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Status Conference set on 10/8/2013 at 03:00 PM until further notice. (mflo, )
September 24, 2013 19 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Status Conference rescheduled to 10/8/2013 at 03:00 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F. Anderson Jr. ***Change in time only***(bshr, )
September 24, 2013 18 TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion to Continue (Postpone) Hearing. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 09/24/2013.(bshr, )
September 23, 2013 17 MOTION to Continue (Postpone) Hearing by Katherine Bradacs, Tracie Goodwin. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2013. No proposed order.(Nichols, John)
September 12, 2013 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson Jr. (bshr, )
September 12, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time, extending deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to 11/15/2013 and notifying parties the court will conduct a status conference on 10/08/2013 at 10:00 AM to discuss whether any discovery will be necessary or whether the case can be submitted to the court on stipulated or undisputed facts. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/12/2013.(bshr, )
September 12, 2013 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson.(Smith, James)
September 12, 2013 11 MOTION for Extension of Time by Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M Wilson. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2013. No proposed order.(Smith, James)
September 10, 2013 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6. Reason: Proof of Service refiled with Notice of Filing and Affidavit of Server. Corrected Filing Document Number 7 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 09/06/2013. Response due date modified to that of original filing: answer due 9/27/2013 (bshr, )
September 9, 2013 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracie Goodwin, Katherine Bradacs. Alan M Wilson served on 9/6/2013, answer due 9/27/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Warner, Carrie)
September 6, 2013 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracie Goodwin, Katherine Bradacs. Nimrata Randhawa Haley served on 9/6/2013, answer due 9/27/2013. (Attachment(s): # 1 Proof of Service) (Warner, Carrie). Modified on 9/10/2013 to add notice of filing and to correct filing date(bshr, ).
August 28, 2013 5 Summons Issued as to Nimrata Randhawa Haley. (bshr, )
August 28, 2013 4 Summons Issued as to Alan M. Wilson. (bshr, )
August 28, 2013 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Katherine Bradacs, Tracie Goodwin.(bshr, )
August 28, 2013 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, INJUNCTIVE, AND OTHER RELIEF against Nimrata Randhawa Haley, Alan M. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-4907050.), filed by Tracie Goodwin, Katherine Bradacs. Service due by 12/30/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Marriage)(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradacs et al v. Haley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Bradacs
Represented By: John Shannon Nichols
Represented By: Carrie A Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Goodwin
Represented By: John Shannon Nichols
Represented By: Carrie A Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nimrata Randhawa Haley
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan M Wilson
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?