Brown v. Dennis et al
Plaintiff: Quinton Brown
Defendant: Anthony Dennis, Jennifer Thomas, S.C. Department of Juvenile Justice, April Skinner, Thomas R Mims, Jr, Hampton Gardner, Robert Burnish, Jennie Daley, Wesley Gardner, Susan Oaks-Thomas, Edward Francis Brown, Willie McFadden, April Skinner McFadden, Crystal Skinner and Shenequa Oaks
Case Number: 3:2015cv03334
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER AND OPINION accepting the 112 Report and Recommendation, granting the 76 Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Sumter County Sheriff Anthony Dennis, Investigator Jennifer Thomas, Thomas R. Mims, Jr., Hampton Ga rdner, Robert Burnish, Jennie Daley, Wesley Gardner, and Willie McFadden, and dismissing Defendants Krystle Skinner, Susan Oaks-Thomas, Edward Francis Brown, and Shenequa Oaks from the action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 9/26/2017. (bgoo)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER directing the plaintiff to provide the court with proof of service of the 1 Complaint upon Defendants Susan Oaks-Thomas, Edward Francis Brown, and Shenequa Oaks by November 28, 2016, or show good cause for failure to serve pursuant to Rule 4(m). Failure to do so will result in these defendants being dismissed from this action for failure to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/16/2016. (bgoo)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER finding that Mr. Webb's opinion evidence is not admissible under Rule 702 and applicable caselaw and is therefore excluded. Motion granted: 55 defendants' motion to exclude evidence from the plaintiff's expert law enforcement witness, Benny Webb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/6/2016. (bgoo)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by S.C. Department of Juvenile Justice, and dismissing the action as to that defendant. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/15/2016. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Dennis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Brown
Represented By: William Gary White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Dennis
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Thomas
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. Department of Juvenile Justice
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Skinner
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R Mims, Jr
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton Gardner
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burnish
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Daley
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Gardner
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Oaks-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Francis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie McFadden
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Skinner McFadden
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenequa Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?