Funderburk et al v. South Carolina Electric & Gas Company
Plaintiff: |
Sharon Funderburk and Thomas Funderburk |
Defendant: |
South Carolina Electric & Gas Company |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv04660 |
Filed: |
November 19, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Columbia Office |
County: |
Lexington |
Presiding Judge: |
J Michelle Childs |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1358 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 1, 2019 |
Filing
251
ORDER AND OPINION granting in part (166) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting in part (150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04695-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; granting in part (150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; granting in part (148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv- 04888-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; granting in part (148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04893-JMC; granting in part(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; granti ng in part (148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04896-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; granting in part (151) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; granting in part (150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; granting in part (128) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; granting in part (144) Motion for Summ ary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01141-JMC; granting in part (153) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC; granting in part (144) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC. The court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdicti on over Plaintiffs' remaining state law claims for negligence and trespass. The court REMANDS Plaintiffs' claims of negligence and trespass to the Lexington County Court of Common Pleas for further proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order of remand to the Clerk of Court of the Lexington County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/1/2019.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
|
July 26, 2019 |
Filing
237
ORDER AND OPINION granting(165) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting(149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; granting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04695-JMC; g ranting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; granting(149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; granting(147) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04888-JMC; granting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; granting(147) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04893-JMC; granting(147) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; granting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; granting(148) Moti on for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; granting(150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; granting(149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; granting(143) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01141-JMC; granting(143) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/26/2019.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
|
June 14, 2019 |
Filing
193
ORDER AND OPINION denying (171) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; denying (155) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04695-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; denying (155) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04888-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15- cv-04893-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04896-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; denying (156) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; denying (155) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; denying (132) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; denying (149) Motion to Remand in case 3:16-cv-01141-JMC; denying (158) Motion to Remand in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC; denying (149) Motion to Remand in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/14/2019.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
50
JOINT STIPULATION ESTABLISHING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL AND ORDER Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/19/2017. Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting (39) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting (27) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; granting (27) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04695- JMC; granting (26) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04888-JMC; granting (25) Motio n for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04889-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04890-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04891-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Ord er in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04893-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04895- JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04896-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; granting (25) Motio n for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04899-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Ord er in case 3:15-cv-04923-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04924-JMC; granting (31) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01141- JMC; granting (28) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC; granting (17) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01144-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/1/2016.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting (20) Motion to Consolidate Cases for in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/9/2016.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC, 3:15-cv-04926-JMC, 3:16-cv-01142-JMC(asni, )
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing
24
ORDER AND OPINION denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 18 Motion for Certification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/27/2016.(asni, )
|
April 15, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER AND OPINION denying 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/15/2016.(asni, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?