Elia v. Wheelz LLC
Plaintiff: Gerald P Elia
Defendant: Wheelz LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04901
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER directing Plaintiff to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendant's 28 motion to dismiss by February 24, 2017. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Response to Motion due by 2/24/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/10/2017. (bgoo)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the court by January 3, 2017, of the identity of the new attorney(s) he has retained to represent him in this case or, alternatively, of his desire to proceed with this litigation pro se. I f Plaintiff retains a new attorney, his attorney should file a notice of appearance on the docket by January 3, 2017. If Plaintiff does not wish to continue this lawsuit, he may request that the court dismiss the case in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 12/20/2016. (mwal)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the Court by November 15, 2016 of the identity of the new attorney(s) he has retained to represent him or, alternatively, of his desire to proceed with this litigation pro se. If Plaintiff d oes not wish to continue this lawsuit, he may request that the court dismiss the case in its entirety. To this end, Plaintiff shall, by November 15, 2016, complete the attached notice and mail it to the Clerk of Court at the address indicated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/1/2016. (mwal)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Gerald P Elia. Attorney Ryan Kyle Hicks terminated. The Plaintiff is directed to notify the court by November 4, 2016, of the identity of the new attorney(s) he has retained to represent him in this case or, alternatively, of his desire to proceed with this litigation pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 10/18/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elia v. Wheelz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald P Elia
Represented By: Arthur K Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheelz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?