Evans v. Richardson, et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Evans
Defendant: Carolina Richardson and Sumter County
Case Number: 3:2016cv03202
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1982 Civil Rights Racial Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER adopting 94 Report and Recommendation to dismiss the amended complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/9/19.(mflo, )
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 7/14/2017. (mwal)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Adopting in part 11 Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's complaint is summarily dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process for failure to sta te a claim. Denied as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Carolina Richardson, Sumter County; Denied as moot 6 Motion for TRO filed by Reginald Evans, denying 18 Motion to Amend the complaint filed by Reginald Evans. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/25/17. (mflo, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Motions granted: 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 10/4/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Richardson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Richardson
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter County
Represented By: James Miller Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?