Reese v. Bank et al
Plaintiff: Harry Eugene Reese, Sr.
Defendant: Robert Bank, John Magill, Maria Marin, Denise Morgan, Vicki Brown, Eleanor Odom and South Carolina Department of Mental Health
Case Number: 3:2016cv03491
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER adopting 93 Report and Recommendation and granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment by South Carolina Department of Mental Health on the claims of discrimination and retaliation; denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment by Harry Eugene Reese, Sr. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/28/18.(mflo, )
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER adopting the 41 Report and Recommendation as modified by the 46 Supplemental Report and Recommendation and granting the Defendants' 29 motion to dismiss as to Reese's claims for defamation, civil conspir acy, intentional infliction of emotional distress, violation of the Equal Pay Act, violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act, and all claims against Dr. Robert Bank, Mr. John Magill, Ms. Maria Marin, Ms. Denise Morgan, Ms. Vicki Brown, and Ms. Eleanor Odom. It is further ordered that the Defendants' 29 motion to dismiss is denied as to Reese's TItle VII claim against the South Carolina Department of Mental Health. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 11/21/2017. (bgoo)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby placed on notice that unless good cause is shown to the court by May 18, 2017, for his failure to effect service of the summonses and complaint on the defendants, plaintiff's action will be recommended for dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/4/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Eugene Reese, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Magill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?