U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Akebono Brake Corporation
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Akebono Brake Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03545
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 69 Report and Recommendation, granting 47 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, granting 45 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/29/2018. (cbru, )
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting EEOC's 73 MOTION to Compel as narrowed to comport with the proportionality of this case. Specifically, the EEOC's request for entry upon land is granted to the extent it requests two counsel for the EEOC and a legal photographer to enter, inspect, and take still photography of the "washer inspection" area not to exceed 60 minutes on a date of Akebono's choosing before the close of discovery under the court's Fourth Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 3/15/2018. (mwal)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER STAYING CASE, granted 62 Consent MOTION to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 1/22/2018. (mwal)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 38 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 7/18/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Akebono Brake Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Rachael Suzanne Steenbergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akebono Brake Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?