Andrews et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: William Jones Andrews, Jr, Robert Arrington, Patrick Babb, Timothy Paul Babb, Agnes Babb, Tyler Bahnmuller, Jennifer Baker, Jeffrey Baker, Bryan Bender, Katie Levia, William Britt, II, Erin Dawn Britt, Jeffrey Burden, Ellen Burden, Debra Burriss, Bradford R Collins, Lewis J Cromer, Carolyn Cromer, Mary Gill, Stanley Hood, Karen Hood, Jeff Inabinet, Elizabeth Inabinet, Ann D Kepley, Jason Kirkham, Ashley Kirkham, Kirby Leitner, Jean Leitner, Linda Lynn, Kimberley MacDonald, Larry McKeown, Stephen Marshall, Welda McCullough, Earl Pierce, Cynthia Pierce, David Reid, David Richardson, Mark Rowland, Scott Caton, Teresa Schlosser, Kathy Siokos, Brady Souder, Elizabeth Souder, Preston Spivey, Mary Mazolla Spivey, Alyssa Stigamier, Damita Trapp, Sabrina Todd, Joseph Osbourne, Alex Umbach, William Wannamaker, Laura Wannamaker, Karen Whalen, Jeffrey Whalen, Jeffrey Wilkinson, James Woods and Cathy Woods
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv03702
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER AND OPINION granting 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/5/2018.(asni, )
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 27 MOTION to Compel. Plaintiffs are ordered to produce documentation responsive to Requests Nos. 112 on or before February 7, 2018. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of thisOrder and ECF Nos. 27-1 and 27-2 to pro se Plaintiffs Bahnmuller, Baker, Burden, Cromer, ( Specific Document due by 2/7/2018 ). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/17/2018. (asni, )
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying as moot 68 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, granting 70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, granting 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, granting 72 MO TION to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 74 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 75 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, granting 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, granting 77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, granting 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 79 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Status Report due by 12/6/2017). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/6/2017. (asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arrington
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Babb
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Paul Babb
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Babb
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Bahnmuller
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Baker
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Baker
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Bender
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Levia
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Britt, II
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Dawn Britt
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Burden
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Burden
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Burriss
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford R Collins
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis J Cromer
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Cromer
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gill
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Hood
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hood
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Inabinet
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Inabinet
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann D Kepley
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kirkham
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Kirkham
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Leitner
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Leitner
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lynn
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley MacDonald
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry McKeown
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Marshall
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welda McCullough
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Pierce
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Pierce
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reid
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Richardson
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rowland
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Caton
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Schlosser
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Siokos
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Souder
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Souder
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Spivey
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mazolla Spivey
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Stigamier
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damita Trapp
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Todd
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Osbourne
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Umbach
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wannamaker
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wannamaker
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Whalen
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Whalen
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wilkinson
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Woods
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Woods
Represented By: William Jones Andrews, Jr
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?