Johnson v. McKnight et al
Plaintiff: Regina Denise Johnson
Defendant: Kenyetta McKnight, Mark A. Turner, Raymond Mitchell and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2017cv00895
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. (mwal)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER adopting and incorporating 60 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendants' motions to dismiss, 27 55 ; and dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/8/2017. (mwal)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER substituting the United States of America as a party defendant in the place of Kenyetta McKnight, Mark A. Turner, and the Department of Veterans Affairs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/11/2017. (bgoo)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The court grants Plaintiff an extension of 30 days to effectuate proper service on the United States of the summons and complaint in this case by demonstrating compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i). By October 6, 2017, Plaintiff is directed to file a proof of service of the summons and complaint on the United States on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/5/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. McKnight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Denise Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyetta McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?