Tate v. Rutherford
Plaintiff: Phyllis Tate
Defendant: J. Todd Rutherford
Case Number: 3:2017cv01124
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. (mwal)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 10 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Plaintiff's 1 Complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 6/14/2017. (mwal)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Motions granted: 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/15/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Todd Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?