Ceasar v. SC Department of Health and Environmental Control
Plaintiff: Lisa Michelle Ceasar
Defendant: SC Department of Health and Environmental Control
Case Number: 3:2017cv02018
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. (mwal)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 35 MOTION to Dismiss and 39 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/5/2018. (mwal)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/4/2017. (bgoo)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER vacating 15 Order dismissing the case and referring the matter to the Magistrate Judge for pre-trial proceedings. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/19/2017. (mwal)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER dismissing this matter without prejudice and without issuance and service of process for Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/13/2017. (mwal)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 9 Report and Recommendation, denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Filing Fee due by 9/7/2017.) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/24/2017. (cbru, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceasar v. SC Department of Health and Environmental Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Michelle Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Department of Health and Environmental Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?