Harrison v. Kennedy et al

Plaintiff: Eugene P Harrison
Defendant: Jennifer C Kennedy and Sumter Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2018cv00057
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND OPINION granting 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file the Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/8/2019.(sshe, )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 55 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider. The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to reconsider only insofar as to clarify that a de nova standard of review applies to PHA determinations contrary to statute or regulation. The motion to reconsider is otherwise DENIED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/7/2018.(sshe, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND OPINION The R & R of the Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 49 ) is ADOPTEDIN PART and REJECTED IN PART. The Court REJECTS the determination of the Magistrate Judge that there is no dispute of material fact regarding when S HA was given Plaintiff's RFTA, and therefore declines to adopt: (i) the sentence beginning on Page 6, line 18 and ending on Page 7, line. 3; (ii) the clause beginning on Page 7, line 10 and ending on Page 7, line 12, and; (iii) thefull paragraph s beginning on Page 8, line 14 and ending on Page 10, line 5. The R & R is otherwise ADOPTED. Therefore, the Court DENIES Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 34 .) as to Plaintiff's claim under the Housing Act of 1937 and GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's disability claims. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/26/2018.(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene P Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer C Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?