Big Red Box LLC v. Square Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Big Red Box LLC |
Defendant: |
Square Inc, American Express Company, William Tye Grisel, Joe Grisel, G5 Marketing Solutions LLC and John Doe Bank |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00758 |
Filed: |
March 19, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Columbia Office |
County: |
Richland |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald C Coggins |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1961 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 16, 2020 |
Filing
215
ORDER AND OPINION finding the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction and therefore REMANDS Plaintiff's conversion claim against Tye Grisel to state court. As a result, the court declines to rule on Tye Grisel's [1 63] Motion to Dismiss which shall be a matter for the state court. The court affirms the Magistrate Judge's reasoning in the 178 Report and Recommendation but declines to rule on the Report since Plaintiff's subsequent dismissal of all but one of the defendants left the court without subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 9/16/2020. (lbak)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing
208
ORDER of Dismissal as the Court having been advised for the parties that the above action has been settled as to defendant, Square, Inc., only, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without preju dice against Square, Inc. If settlement is not consummated within sixty (60) days, either party pay petition the Court to reopen this action and restore it to the calendar. Square, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/19/2020. (lbak)
|
September 3, 2019 |
Filing
145
ORDER denying 144 motion for redaction of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file an unredacted copy of its Third Amended Complaint by September 9, 2019. Defendants deadline to file a responsive pleading is September 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/3/2019. (bgoo)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
115
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/18/2019. (bgoo)
|
February 19, 2019 |
Filing
87
AMENDED ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION accepting the Magistrate Judges 73 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Defendant's 42 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/19/2019. (asni, )
|
February 15, 2019 |
Filing
85
ORDER accepting the Magistrate Judge's 73 Report and Recommendation and denying Defendant's 42 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 2/15/2019. (lbak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?