Kraim v. Columbia Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim
Defendant: Columbia Police Department, Columbia Housing Authority, Richland County Sheriff Dept. and Richland Springs
Case Number: 3:2018cv01335
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER adopting 58 Report and Recommendation, dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/18/2019. (cbru, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT Plaintiff is hereby granted twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered (plus three days mail time) to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint that corrects those deficiencies, this action will be recommended for summary dismissal. (Specific Document due by 5/30/2019.) Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Specific Document due by 5/30/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/7/2019. (lbak)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting 12 Report and Recommendation, dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/7/2018. (cbru, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraim v. Columbia Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?