Robertson v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Paul E Cruise and Mary Ann Robertson
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc, Schneider Electric USA Inc, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Gardner Denver Inc, Trane US Inc, Fluor Enterprises Inc, Fluor Constructors International, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Southwire Company LLC, Warren Pumps LLC, Covil Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, API Heat Transfer Inc, IMO Industries Inc, Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable, General Electric Company, Ecodyne Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Flowserve US Inc, Rockwell Automation Inc, Clark-Reliance Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp, AT&T Corporation, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Nokia of America Corporation, Crane Co, Alfa Laval Inc, Nash Engineering Company, The, Goulds Pumps Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Thermo Electric Company Inc, Fisher Controls International LLC, Spirax Sarco Inc, Crosby Valve LLC, Eaton Corporation, CBS Corporation, McNally Industries LLC, Aurora Pump Company, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, BW/IP Inc, SPX Cooling Technologies Inc, Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable LLC, Viad Corp, Flowserve Corporation, CNA Holdings LLC and Celanese Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01842
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 366 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 6, 2020 Filing 365 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Spirax Sarco Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 4, 2020 Filing 363 Withdrawal of Motions: #339 MOTION for Protective Order filed by General Electric Company.. (Techman, Jennifer) (Main Document 363 replaced on 2/5/2020 to correct case number on document as verified by filing user) (lgib, ).
January 31, 2020 Filing 362 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 31, 2020 Filing 361 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of CBS Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Techman, Jennifer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 359 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 358 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 357 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of Trane US Inc (Techman, Jennifer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 356 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 355 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 354 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 353 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Ecodyne Corporation (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 352 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Goulds Pumps Inc (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 351 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Nash Engineering Company, The (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 350 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc (Meriwether, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 349 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by API Heat Transfer Inc. (Holmes, Janice)
January 31, 2020 Filing 348 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Notice of Service of Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Flynn, Stephanie)
January 31, 2020 Filing 347 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Final Expert and Lay Witness Designations by Breon C Walker on behalf of Schneider Electric USA Inc (Walker, Breon)
January 31, 2020 Filing 346 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Matthew Todd Carroll on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Carroll, Matthew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 345 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Notice of Service of Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Armstrong International Inc (Flynn, Stephanie)
January 31, 2020 Filing 344 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Scott E Frick on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises Inc (Frick, Scott)
January 31, 2020 Filing 343 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Thoensen, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Filing 342 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by William P Early on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Early, William)
January 27, 2020 Filing 341 TEXT ORDER granting #340 Motion to Stay. All deadlines set forth in the First Amended Agreed Joint Scheduling Order are hereby stayed as to Defendant Crane Co. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 1/27/2020. (lgib, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 340 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines as to Crane Co. by Crane Co. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sullivan, Tara)
January 22, 2020 Filing 339 MOTION for Protective Order by General Electric Company. Response to Motion due by 2/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Plaintiff Notice of Deposition 30b6 of GE for 11-6-19, #2 Ex B - GE Objections to Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition 30b6 served 10-23-19, #3 Ex C - Plaintiff Notice of Deposition 30b6 of GE - Amended for 12-11-2019, #4 Ex D - GE 1975 Buylog, #5 Ex E - GE Objections to Plaintiff Notice of Deposition 30b6 (plastics witness), #6 Ex F - Ray Watson 6-5-19 Excerpts, #7 Ex G - GE Letter from EWH to Plaintiff Counsel re document production 9-24-2019, #8 Ex H - Philip Hopkinson 11-6-19 Dep Excerpts, #9 EX I - GE Letter from Paine Bickers to DOB re meet and confer to resolve discovery issues 10-23-2019, #10 EX J - GE Letter from Paine Tarwater to DOB re Deposition Phil Hopkinson 11-26-2019, #11 Ex K - 11-19-19 and 12-17-19 emails)No proposed order.(Techman, Jennifer) Modified on 1/23/2020 to add descriptive names to exhibits as provided by filer(hcic, ).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER: Based on the representations to the Court and for good cause shown, all claims brought against Defendant Fisher Controls International, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Each party will bear its own costs. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 1/16/2020. (lsut, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 336 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Fisher Controls International LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McLeod, Yancey)
January 7, 2020 Filing 335 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Chief Judge Terry L Wooten no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #333 Motion for Sarena Holder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on January 2, 2020.(kbos)
December 31, 2019 Filing 333 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarena M. Holder ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8853768) by Rockwell Automation Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thoensen, Joseph)
December 19, 2019 Filing 331 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CNA Holdings LLC. (Early, William)
December 17, 2019 Filing 330 CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dismissing without prejudice defendant TE Wire & Cable LLC incorrectly served as Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TE Wire & Cable LLC f/k/a Thermo-Electric Wire & Cable Co). Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on December 16, 2019. (kbos)
December 2, 2019 Filing 328 TEXT ORDER granting #325 Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion to Withdraw Christopher A. Jaros as Counsel. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on December 2, 2019.(kbos)
November 25, 2019 Filing 327 REPLY to Response to Motion re #323 Supplemental MOTION to Compel ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Response filed by Mary Ann Robertson. (Holder, Jonathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 326 Letter from Plaintiffs to ACOR re Withdrawal of First Amended Notice of Deposition of Ecodyne Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of First Amended Notice of Intent to Take the 30(b)(6) Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Ecodyne Corporation)(Holder, Jonathan) (Main Document 326 replaced on 12/12/2019 with corrected pdf) (kbos).
November 21, 2019 Filing 325 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Crane Co. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Jaros, Christopher)
November 18, 2019 Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re #323 Supplemental MOTION to Compel ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Response filed by Rockwell Automation Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Thoensen, Joseph)
November 4, 2019 Filing 323 Supplemental MOTION to Compel ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION by Mary Ann Robertson. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)No proposed order.(Holder, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 320 Withdrawal of Motions: #313 MOTION to Compel Defendant Schneider Electric USA, INC., F/K/A Square D Company filed by Mary Ann Robertson.. (Holder, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re #312 MOTION to Compel Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. Response filed by Rockwell Automation Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/6/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supp. Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Supp. Responses to Requests for Production)(Thoensen, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Filing 318 TEXT ORDER granting #316 Motion for John Elder to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant General Electric Company. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on October 30, 2019.(kbos)
October 30, 2019 Filing 317 TEXT ORDER granting #315 Motion for Chris Massenburg to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Eaton Corporation. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on October 30, 2019.(kbos)
October 28, 2019 Filing 316 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Elder ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8745374) by General Electric Company. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Techman, Jennifer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 315 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chris O. Massenburg ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8743829) by Eaton Corporation. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Proposed Order proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Early, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 314 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp. (Brown, Stephen) (Main Document 314 replaced on 11/1/2019 with corrected pdf) (kbos).
October 16, 2019 Filing 313 MOTION to Compel Defendant Schneider Electric USA, INC., F/K/A Square D Company by Mary Ann Robertson. Response to Motion due by 10/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pltf 2nd Set of Rogs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pltf 2nd Set of RFP)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holder, Jonathan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 312 MOTION to Compel Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Mary Ann Robertson. Response to Motion due by 10/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pltf 2nd Set of Rogs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rockwell Resp 2nd Set of Rogs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plts 2nd Set of RFPs, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rockwell Resp 2nd Set of RFP)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holder, Jonathan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 311 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Southwire Company LLC. (Twilley, Allyson) (Main Document 311 replaced on 10/22/2019 with corrected pdf) (kbos).
September 26, 2019 Filing 309 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp.(Brown, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 308 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Ecodyne Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Viad Corp. (Meriwether, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 305 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Viad Corp. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's First Amended Responses to Defs Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B-Moody's Report for 1962, #3 Exhibit C-Articles of Dissolution, #4 Exhibit D-Towpath to Towpath Article, #5 Exhibit E-Merger Agreement, #6 Exhibit F- (Part 1) 1965 Armour Tax Return, #7 Exhibit F- (Part 2) 1965 Armour Tax Return, #8 Exhibit G-Excerpts from 1965 Armour Tax Return, #9 Exhibit H- 10/16/2007 Deposition of Peter Novak, #10 Exhibit I-Insurance Policies, #11 Exhibit J-Application for Amended Certificate of Authority, #12 Exhibit K-Consent To Dissolution)No proposed order.(Meriwether, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 304 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by BW/IP Inc.(Brown, Terry)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #189 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #221 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fraudulent Misrepresentation claim are GRANTED and that claim against AIW and BW/IP is hereby DISMISSED. Defendants Motions to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) are DENIED, and BW/IPs Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is also DENIED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on August 6, 2019.(kbos)
August 1, 2019 Filing 301 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Thoensen, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 300 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 299 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary Ann Robertson.(Holder, Jonathan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 298 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve Corporation.(Baker, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 297 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Aurora Pump Company.(Carroll, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 296 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp, Southwire Company LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
July 24, 2019 Filing 295 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Walker, Breon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 294 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by API Heat Transfer Inc.(Holmes, Janice)
July 24, 2019 Filing 293 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Eaton Corporation.(Early, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 292 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by CNA Holdings LLC, Celanese Corporation.(Early, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 291 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 290 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Armstrong International Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 289 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by SPX Cooling Technologies Inc.(Gordon, Frank)
July 23, 2019 Filing 288 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Covil Corporation.(Brathwaite, Ashley)
July 23, 2019 Filing 287 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co.(Jaros, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 286 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Jordan, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 285 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fisher Controls International LLC.(McLeod, Yancey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 284 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Clark-Reliance Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 283 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 282 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trane US Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 281 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by CBS Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 280 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 279 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 278 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 277 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by McNally Industries LLC.(Frick, Scott)
July 23, 2019 Filing 276 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by FMC Corporation.(Frick, Scott) (Main Document 276 replaced on 7/24/2019 per attorney request) (kbos).
July 23, 2019 Filing 275 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Constructors International Inc.(Frick, Scott)
July 23, 2019 Filing 274 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Enterprises Inc.(Frick, Scott)
July 23, 2019 Filing 273 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Frick, Scott)
July 23, 2019 Filing 272 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel International Corporation.(Frick, Scott)
July 23, 2019 Filing 271 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Goulds Pumps Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 270 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 269 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 268 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 267 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ecodyne Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 266 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Viad Corp.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 265 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 264 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 263 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 262 FIRST AMENDED AGREED JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER( Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/19/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/20/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/31/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/29/2020, Discovery due by 11/15/2019, Motions due by 3/25/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/8/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 4/29/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2020, Mediation Due by 2/28/2020). Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 7/8/19. (mflo, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 260 TEXT ORDER granting #259 Motion to Substitute Attorney M. Todd Carroll for defendant Aurora Pump Company. Directed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 7/8/19.(mflo, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 259 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Aurora Pump Company. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Carroll, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 258 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Mary Ann Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holder, Jonathan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 257 TEXT ORDER granting #230 unopposed Motion for an order to convene a Rule 26(f) conference. Parties are directed to participate in a Rule 26(f) conference and submit a joint Rule 26(f) report within 30 days. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on June 20, 2019.(kbos)
June 19, 2019 Filing 256 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Covil Corporation.(Brathwaite, Ashley)
June 18, 2019 Filing 255 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Armstrong International Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 254 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Armstrong International Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
June 18, 2019 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 254 (Text Order) Reason: entered in error (kbos)
June 17, 2019 Filing 253 TEXT ORDER granting #248 parties' consent Motion to Substitute Attorney on Behalf of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. ECF No. 248. By agreement, the current attorneys of record wish to withdraw and substitute Stephanie G. Flynn and Nicolas J. Cherry of Fox Rothschild LLP as attorneys of record for Armstrong. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on June 17, 2019.(kbos)
June 17, 2019 Filing 252 TEXT ORDER granting #244 parties' consent Motion to Substitute Attorney on Behalf of Defendant Covil Corporation. ECF No. 244. By agreement, the current attorneys of record wish to withdraw and substitute Ashley K. Braithwaite of Ellis & Winters LLP as attorney of record for Covil. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on June 17, 2019.(kbos)
June 17, 2019 Filing 251 TEXT ORDER granting #242 Motion to Substitute Attorney on Behalf of Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. ECF No. 242. By agreement, the current attorneys of record wish to withdraw and substitute Charles J. Baker, III of Womble Bond Dickinson LLP as attorney of record for Flowserve. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on June 17, 2019.(kbos)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #245 Motion for Erik Nadolink to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on June 14, 2019.(kbos)
June 3, 2019 Filing 248 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order for Substitution)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Flynn, Stephanie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 247 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 245 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erik D. Nadolink ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8453593) by Crane Co. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Erik Nadolink's Application/Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jaros, Christopher)
May 9, 2019 Filing 244 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Covil Corporation. Response to Motion due by 5/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Brathwaite, Ashley)
May 9, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
May 1, 2019 Filing 242 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Flowserve Corporation. Response to Motion due by 5/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Baker, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Baker, III on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Baker, Charles)
April 19, 2019 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 241 - (proposed scheduling order) Reason: Proposed orders are not to be filed. Please email all proposed orders to chambers. (kbos)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #238 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin D. Braly for the Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/5/2019.(mbro, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 238 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin D. Braly for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8359615) by Mary Ann Robertson. Response to Motion due by 4/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Admission Application, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for PHV Admission of Ben Braly)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McVey, Theile)
March 27, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Ann Robertson (Holder, Jonathan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition re #230 MOTION R. 16.01(A) Tentative Order to conduct 26(f) Conference Response filed by Thermo Electric Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/27/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Dixon, Joshua)
February 8, 2019 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry M Brown, Jr on behalf of BW/IP Inc (Brown, Terry)
February 6, 2019 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP Inc identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation, Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP Inc.. (Horton, Greg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 231 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve Corporation.(Twilley, Allyson)
February 6, 2019 Filing 230 MOTION R. 16.01(A) Tentative Order to conduct 26(f) Conference by Mary Ann Robertson. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting P's motion for R. 16.01 tentative order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holder, Jonathan)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #223 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Joanna Brooks Stroud for AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp,Joanna Brooks Stroud for Southwire Company LLC, terminating Mary S Willis. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on January 18, 2019.(kbos)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #187 Motion for Andrew Spradlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for SPX Cooling Technologies Inc). Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on January 15, 2019.(kbos)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #222 Motion for Philip C. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Fisher Controls International). Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on January 15, 2019.(kbos)
January 9, 2019 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #221 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM & FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION Response filed by Mary Ann Robertson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/16/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 223 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp, Southwire Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Brown, Stephen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 222 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip C. Reid ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8190572) by Fisher Controls International LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Application and Affidavit of Reid, #2 Proposed Order Ex 2 Proposed Order Granting Reid PHV Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McLeod, Yancey)
December 26, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM & FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by BW/IP Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit -A_10-1-2018_Affidavit of Charleston Armstrong, #3 Exhibit -B_4-11-2018_BW-IP Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit -C_Salley v. Heartland-Charleston of Hanahan, #5 Exhibit -D_Harlan v. Wydawniczo-Reklamowa, #6 Exhibit -E_Giro v. Estevill, #7 Exhibit -F_Seithel v. Feldman & Pinto, #8 Exhibit -G_Hottinger v. Amcoal Energy Corp., #9 Exhibit -H_Gibson v. Confie Ins. Group Holdings)No proposed order.(Horton, Greg) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct file date (kbos).
December 26, 2018 Filing 220 Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company Inc.'s ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Twilley, Allyson)
December 21, 2018 Filing 219 REPLY to Response to Motion re #211 MOTION to Stay re #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Thermo Electric Company Inc. (Dixon, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 218 REPLY to Response to Motion re #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Thermo Electric Company Inc. (Dixon, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #216 Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on December 21, 2018.(kbos)
December 20, 2018 Filing 216 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp, Southwire Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Brown, Stephen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 215 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Mary Ann Robertson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/21/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 214 RESPONSE in Opposition re #211 MOTION to Stay re #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Mary Ann Robertson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/21/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 213 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Mary Ann Robertson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/20/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 212 Summons Issued as to BW/IP Inc, Flowserve Corporation. (kbos)
November 30, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION to Stay re #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua)
November 30, 2018 Filing 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua)
November 30, 2018 Filing 209 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 208 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Viad Corp.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 207 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Thermo Electric Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 206 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 205 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Goulds Pumps Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 204 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Ecodyne Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 203 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 202 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 201 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 200 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 199 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 198 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by API Heat Transfer Inc.(Holmes, Janice)
November 30, 2018 Filing 197 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(Early, William)
November 30, 2018 Filing 196 ANSWER to Complaint by CNA Holdings LLC.(Early, William)
November 30, 2018 Filing 195 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Walker, Breon)
November 29, 2018 Filing 194 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
November 29, 2018 Filing 193 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
November 29, 2018 Filing 192 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by SPX Cooling Technologies Inc.(Gordon, Frank)
November 29, 2018 Filing 191 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Fisher Controls International LLC.(McLeod, Yancey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 190 Southwire Company, LLC, as successor-in-interest to American Insulated Wire Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Southwire Company LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
November 29, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum - Affidavit of Vince Lonigro)No proposed order.(Brown, Stephen)
November 29, 2018 Filing 188 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Crosby Valve LLC. (McLeod, Yancey)
November 28, 2018 Filing 187 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew B. Spradlin ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8131267) by SPX Cooling Technologies Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for PHV Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Gordon, Frank)
November 28, 2018 Filing 186 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Inc.(Montgomery, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 185 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Southwire Company LLC.(Twilley, Allyson)
November 26, 2018 Filing 183 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 182 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 181 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 180 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 179 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 178 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 177 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 176 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 175 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Trane US Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 174 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Jordan, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 173 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by McNally Industries LLC.(Conner, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 172 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Conner, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 171 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Fluor Enterprises Inc.(Conner, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 170 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Fluor Constructors International Inc.(Conner, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 169 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Conner, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 168 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Daniel International Corporation.(Conner, William)
November 21, 2018 Filing 167 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Pugh, Steven)
November 21, 2018 Filing 166 ANSWER to #165 Amended Complaint by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
November 16, 2018 Filing 165 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against All Defendants, filed by Paul E Cruise. Service due by 2/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Against Flowserve, #2 Summons Against BW-IP) (McVey, Theile)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 TEXT ORDER granting #144 Motion for Leave to File, Plaintiffs unopposed motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, ECF No. 144, is hereby GRANTED. In light of the Courts decision to grant Plaintiffs motion, all remaining pending motions are hereby deemed MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on November 16, 2018.(kbos)
November 5, 2018 Filing 162 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #159 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua)
November 5, 2018 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice Holmes on behalf of API Heat Transfer Inc (Holmes, Janice)
October 29, 2018 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Paul E Cruise.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/5/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION to Stay re #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Paul E Cruise.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/5/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 158 RESPONSE to Motion re #144 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Response filed by Thermo Electric Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/2/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Dixon, Joshua)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TEXT ORDER granting #131 Motion for Tina Cundari and Robert Stepp to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant Flowserve US Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on October 19, 2018.(kbos)
October 18, 2018 Filing 155 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Covil Corporation.(Wall, Mark)
October 18, 2018 Filing 154 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Armstrong International Inc.(Wall, Mark)
October 15, 2018 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #119 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Paul E Cruise.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/22/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Response filed by Paul E Cruise.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/22/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 151 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thermo Electric Company Inc.(Dixon, Joshua)
October 15, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION to Stay re #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua)
October 15, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua)
October 15, 2018 Filing 148 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SPX Cooling Technologies Inc.(Gordon, Frank)
October 15, 2018 Filing 147 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 146 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 145 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US Inc.(Montgomery, John)
October 12, 2018 Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Paul E Cruise. Response to Motion due by 10/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Letters Testamentary, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Proposed 2nd Am. Complaint)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holder, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies Inc identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation for SPX Cooling Technologies Inc.. (Gordon, Frank)
October 12, 2018 Filing 142 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by SPX Cooling Technologies Inc.(Gordon, Frank)
October 12, 2018 Filing 141 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CNA Holdings LLC.(Early, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 140 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Celanese Corporation.(Early, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNA Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Celanese Corporation, Corporate Parent CELANESE AMERICAS LLC, Corporate Parent CELANESE US HOLDINGS LLC for CNA Holdings LLC.. (Early, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 138 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celanese Corporation. (Early, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 137 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by CNA Holdings LLC, Celanese Corporation.(Early, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 136 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Viad Corp.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 135 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Viad Corp.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 134 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Ecodyne Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 133 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Thermo Electric Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TEXT ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Thermo Electric Company Inc answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on October 4, 2018.(kbos)
October 3, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Tina M. Cundari and Robert E. Stepp by Flowserve US Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Montgomery, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 130 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Flowserve US Inc.(Montgomery, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 129 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Clark-Reliance Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
October 2, 2018 Filing 128 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 127 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 126 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 125 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Aurora Pump Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 124 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 123 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Goulds Pumps Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 122 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
October 1, 2018 Filing 121 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 120 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US Inc.(Twilley, Allyson)
October 1, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Flowserve US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)No proposed order.(Twilley, Allyson)
October 1, 2018 Filing 118 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Walker, Breon)
October 1, 2018 Filing 117 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by API Heat Transfer Inc.(Culbreath, Gray)
October 1, 2018 Filing 116 Southwire Company, LLC as Successor-In-Interest to American Insulated Wire Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Southwire Company LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
October 1, 2018 Filing 115 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US Inc.(Twilley, Allyson)
October 1, 2018 Filing 114 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Corporate Disclosure)(Wall, Mark)
October 1, 2018 Filing 113 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua)
October 1, 2018 Filing 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process ( Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Flowserve US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)No proposed order.(Twilley, Allyson)
October 1, 2018 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation.. (Early, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Eaton Corporation.(Early, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - Affidavit of Vince Lonigro)No proposed order.(Brown, Stephen)
October 1, 2018 Filing 108 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by McNally Industries LLC.(Conner, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 107 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by FMC Corporation.(Conner, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 106 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Fluor Enterprises Inc.(Conner, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 105 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Daniel International Corporation.(Conner, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 104 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Fluor Constructors International Inc.(Conner, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 103 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Conner, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 102 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Southwire Company LLC.(Twilley, Allyson)
October 1, 2018 Filing 101 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
October 1, 2018 Filing 100 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 99 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Jordan, Jennifer)
September 28, 2018 Filing 98 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Fisher Controls International LLC.(Bouch, Timothy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 97 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Fisher Controls International LLC.(Bouch, Timothy)
September 27, 2018 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 89 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 88 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 87 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trane US Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 86 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 85 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CBS Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 84 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 82 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Trane US Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 79 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by CBS Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 78 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 26, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by John M Montgomery on behalf of Flowserve US Inc (Montgomery, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 76 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 20, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Gardner Denver Inc, Warren Pumps LLC (Cherry, Nicolas)
September 18, 2018 Filing 74 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Pugh, Steven)
September 18, 2018 Filing 73 Summons Issued as to CNA Holdings LLC, Celanese Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies Inc, Viad Corp. (kbos)
September 17, 2018 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp, API Heat Transfer Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc, Armstrong International Inc, Aurora Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Clark-Reliance Corporation, Covil Corporation, Crane Co, Crosby Valve LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Ecodyne Corporation, FMC Corporation, Fisher Controls International LLC, Flowserve US Inc, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver Inc, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, IMO Industries Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable, McNally Industries LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Nash Engineering Company, The, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc, Schneider Electric USA Inc, Southwire Company LLC, Spirax Sarco Inc, Thermo Electric Company Inc, Trane US Inc, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, CNA Holdings LLC, Celanese Corporatin, SPX Cooling Technologies Inc, Viad Corp, filed by Paul E Cruise. Service due by 12/17/2018 (Holder, Jonathan) Modified on 9/18/2018 to add new defendants (kbos).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #13 Motion to Stay; finding as moot #13 Motion for More Definite Statement; finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #44 Motion to Dismiss; granting #61 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot #67 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #68 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within 10 days. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on September 6, 2018.(kbos)
August 28, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by A Victor Rawl, Jr on behalf of Thermo Electric Company Inc (Rawl, A)
August 27, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION to Stay by Thermo Electric Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2018. Prooposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua)
August 27, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 9/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Thermo Electric Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NJ incorporation link, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - Mahon Deposition excerpt)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua)
August 27, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Wallace Dixon on behalf of Thermo Electric Company Inc (Dixon, Joshua)
August 27, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G Tate, Jr on behalf of Flowserve US Inc (Tate, Ronald)
August 27, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G Tate, Jr on behalf of Flowserve US Inc (Tate, Ronald)
August 20, 2018 Filing 63 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thermo Electric Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
August 20, 2018 Filing 62 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ecodyne Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
August 16, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Paul E Cruise. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holder, Jonathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Paul E Cruise.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/17/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holder, Jonathan)
August 8, 2018 Filing 58 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Goulds Pumps Inc.(Glenn, James)
August 8, 2018 Filing 57 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Frick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 56 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by McNally Industries LLC.(Frick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 55 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FMC Corporation.(Frick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 54 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Enterprises Inc.(Frick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 53 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Constructors International Inc.(Frick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 52 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel International Corporation.(Frick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Nokia of America Corporation. (Bouch, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AT&T Corporation. (Bouch, Timothy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 49 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by McNally Industries LLC. (Frick, Scott)
August 3, 2018 Filing 48 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US Inc.(Hutchens, Rachel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint by Flowserve US Inc.(Hutchens, Rachel)
July 27, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint by McNally Industries LLC.(McDonald, Moffatt)
July 27, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint by FMC Corporation.(McDonald, Moffatt)
July 27, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Supoort - Affidavit of Vince LoNigro)No proposed order.(Willis, Mary)
July 27, 2018 Filing 43 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp.(Willis, Mary)
July 26, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Flowserve US Inc.(Twilley, Allyson)
July 26, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by Flowserve US Inc.(Twilley, Allyson)
July 25, 2018 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Jordan, Jennifer)
July 24, 2018 Filing 39 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Paul E Cruise. (Holder, Jonathan)
July 24, 2018 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Walker, Breon)
July 24, 2018 Filing 37 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Walker, Breon)
July 24, 2018 Filing 36 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Southwire Company LLC.(Twilley, Allyson)
July 23, 2018 Filing 35 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Covil Corporation.(Wall, Mark)
July 23, 2018 Filing 34 Southwire Company, LLC as Successor-In-Interest to American Insulated Wire Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Southwire Company LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
July 23, 2018 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aurora Pump Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2018 Filing 32 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2018 Filing 31 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2018 Filing 30 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2018 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 23, 2018 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 20, 2018 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Pugh, Steven)
July 20, 2018 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Pugh, Steven)
July 20, 2018 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gardner Denver Inc.(Flynn, Stephanie)
July 20, 2018 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps LLC.(Flynn, Stephanie)
July 19, 2018 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul E Cruise.(Holder, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fisher Controls International LLC.(Bouch, Timothy)
July 19, 2018 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crosby Valve LLC.(Bouch, Timothy)
July 19, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 19, 2018 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eaton Corporation.(Early, William)
July 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Early on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Early, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen L Brown on behalf of AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp (Brown, Stephen)
July 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 7/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(McLeod, Yancey)
July 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 7/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by AT&T Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(McLeod, Yancey)
July 13, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 12, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay Discovery and, in the Alternative, MOTION for a More Definite Statement and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fisher Controls International LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit)No proposed order.(Bouch, Timothy). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION for More Definite Statement,MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 7/12/2018 (asni, ).
July 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay Discovery and,in the Alternative, MOTION for a More Definite Statement and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Crosby Valve LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit)No proposed order.(Bouch, Timothy). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION for More Definite Statement,MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 7/12/2018 (asni, ).
July 9, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable (TE Wire & Cable LLC, originally filed in state court 7/5/2018).(asni, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Ecodyne Corporation. (originally filed in state court on 7/5/2018)(asni, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G Tate, Jr on behalf of Southwire Company LLC (Tate, Ronald)
July 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Bowman White on behalf of Southwire Company LLC (White, Daniel)
July 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Rebecca Twilley on behalf of Southwire Company LLC (Twilley, Allyson)
July 5, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co.(kbos)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Richland County, case number 2018-CP-40-2849. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7870365), filed by Crane Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Pantaleoni Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C, Part 1, #4 Exhibit C, Part 2, #5 Exhibit C, Part 3A, #6 Exhibit C, Part 3B, #7 Exhibit C, Part 4, #8 Exhibit D, Part 1, #9 Exhibit D, Part 2, #10 Exhibit E, State Court documents)(kbos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E Cruise
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Robertson
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Holder
Represented By: Benjamin Dale Braly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Thomas Brian Boger
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc
Represented By: Breon C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jordan
Represented By: John Steward Slosson
Represented By: Erika Karnaszewski Fedelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwire Company LLC
Represented By: Stephen L Brown
Represented By: Mary Skahan Willis
Represented By: Daniel Bowman White
Represented By: Ronald G Tate, Jr
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Joanna Brooks Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Represented By: Thomas Brian Boger
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Heat Transfer Inc
Represented By: Gray Thomas Culbreath
Represented By: Janice Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: William Ansel Collins, Jr
Represented By: Michal Kalwajtys
Represented By: Thomas F Dougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Represented By: John Willard Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecodyne Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage & Valve Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Robert Erving Stepp
Represented By: Rachel M Hutchens
Represented By: Tina Marie Cundari
Represented By: Ronald G Tate, Jr
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation Inc
Represented By: Joseph E Thoensen
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Represented By: Sarena M Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark-Reliance Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIW-2010 Wind Down Corp
Represented By: Stephen L Brown
Represented By: Mary Skahan Willis
Represented By: Joanna Brooks Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Represented By: Timothy William Bouch
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Melvin
Represented By: Amy M McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International Inc
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By: Timothy William Bouch
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Melvin
Represented By: Amy M McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Christopher Austin Jaros
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Represented By: Erik David Nadolink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company, The
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Electric Company Inc
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: Joshua Wallace Dixon
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Controls International LLC
Represented By: Timothy William Bouch
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Melvin
Represented By: Philip C Reid
Represented By: Amy M McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve LLC
Represented By: Timothy William Bouch
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Melvin
Represented By: Amy M McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: William P Early
Represented By: Chris O Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries LLC
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Terry M Brown, Jr
Represented By: Greg Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies Inc
Represented By: Andrew Spradlin
Represented By: Frank Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Charles J Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Holdings LLC
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celanese Corporation
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?