Blanchard Machinery Company v. BES Design/Build LLC et al
Plaintiff: Blanchard Machinery Company
Defendant: Joseph L Banach, III, BES Design/Build LLC and Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01959
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Blanchard Machinery Company. (Floyd, Joey)
September 4, 2018 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #13 Letter . Capitol Indemnity Corporation answer due 9/25/2018. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/4/18.(mflo, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #13 Letter by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Towery, Katie)
August 29, 2018 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER Granting #22 MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff to Respond to BES Design/Build, LLC's Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Blanchard Machinery Company, ( Response to Motion due by 9/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ). Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 8/29/18. (mflo, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff to Respond to BES Design/Build, LLC's Motion to Set Aside Default by Blanchard Machinery Company. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Floyd, Joey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for L. Graves Stiff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 8/24/18.(mflo, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. graves Stiff, III ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7963751) by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Outten, Samuel)
August 24, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel W Outten on behalf of Capitol Indemnity Corporation (Outten, Samuel)
August 24, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Elizabeth Towery on behalf of Capitol Indemnity Corporation (Towery, Katie)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Set Aside Default by BES Design/Build LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Peace, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Peace on behalf of BES Design/Build LLC, Joseph L Banach, III (Peace, Michael)
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BES Design/Build LLC per #14 Request for Entry of Default by plaintiff. (mflo, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Capitol Indemnity Corporation answer due 9/4/2018. Refiled using the correct event. (mflo, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT As to BES Design/Build, LLC Only byBlanchard Machinery Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel, Joey R. Floyd)(Floyd, Joey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanchard Machinery Company. Capitol Indemnity Corporation served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Floyd, Joey)
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanchard Machinery Company. Joseph L Banach, III served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Floyd, Joey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8 Reason: document refiled with correct signature and event code. Corrected Filing Document Number #9 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/23/18. (mflo, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanchard Machinery Company. Proof of Service BES Design/Build LLC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Floyd, Joey) Modified on 7/25/2018 to correct filing date (mflo, ).
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (mflo, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joseph L Banach, III. (mflo, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BES Design/Build LLC. (mflo, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blanchard Machinery Company.(mflo, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BES Design/Build LLC, Joseph L Banach, III, Capitol Indemnity Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7892251.), filed by Blanchard Machinery Company. Service due by 10/15/2018(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard Machinery Company v. BES Design/Build LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L Banach, III
Represented By: Michael Alan Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BES Design/Build LLC
Represented By: Michael Alan Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Towery
Represented By: Samuel W Outten
Represented By: L Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanchard Machinery Company
Represented By: Edward Wade Mullins, III
Represented By: Joey R Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?