Varner v. South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Anthony L Varner
Defendant: South Carolina Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Palmetto Casualty Insurance Company, South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company, Oconee County Farm Bureau, Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, A, B, and C Corporations and Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02098
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 defendant's consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company to file a response to the complaint is extended to October 3, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on September 11, 2018.(kbos)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Consent to Extension)No proposed order.(Haselden, Thomas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Foster Haselden on behalf of Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company (Haselden, Thomas)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by South Carolina Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company, Palmetto Casualty Insurance Company. South Carolina Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Palmetto Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Dubberly, David)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint,. First attachment description: Complaint Exhibits (24) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 1-14, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 15-24)(Gaffney, Amy)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Palmetto Casualty Insurance Company, South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company. (mflo, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anthony L Varner.(mflo, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A, B, and C Corporations, Oconee County Farm Bureau, Palmetto Casualty Insurance Company, South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company, South Carolina Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. See doc #5 for additional attachments ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7916126.), filed by Anthony L Varner. Service due by 10/29/2018(mflo, ) Modified on 8/3/2018 (kbos).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varner v. South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Marguerite S Willis
Represented By: James Andrew Byars
Represented By: David Eugene Dubberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marguerite S Willis
Represented By: James Andrew Byars
Represented By: David Eugene Dubberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Farm Bureau Insurance Company
Represented By: Marguerite S Willis
Represented By: James Andrew Byars
Represented By: David Eugene Dubberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oconee County Farm Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marguerite S Willis
Represented By: James Andrew Byars
Represented By: David Eugene Dubberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B, and C Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Foster Haselden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L Varner
Represented By: William E Applegate, IV
Represented By: David B Yarborough, Jr
Represented By: Amy Lohr Gaffney
Represented By: Christopher James Bryant
Represented By: Regina Hollins Lewis
Represented By: Susan Rawls Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?