Portee v. Apple Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Portee
Defendant: Apple Incorporated, Asurion Insurance Services, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv02106
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Apple Incorporated.(Roquemore, Jonathan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Apple Incorporated.(Roquemore, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/21/2018. (cbru, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 10/25/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/20/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/20/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/22/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/22/2019, Discovery due by 3/20/2019, Motion in Limine due by 7/1/2019, Motions due by 4/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/18/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 7/22/2019, Mediation Due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/21/2018. (cbru, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Asurion Insurance Services, Inc..(Culbreath, Gray)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Asurion Insurance Services, Inc..(Culbreath, Gray)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gray Thomas Culbreath on behalf of Asurion Insurance Services, Inc. (Culbreath, Gray)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronnie Portee. Asurion Insurance Services, Inc. served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) Filing corrected for event type (cbru, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronnie Portee. Apple Incorporated served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Filing corrected for event type (cbru, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Apple Incorporated answer due 9/25/2018; Asurion Insurance Services, Inc. answer due 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Emails Consenting to Extension of Time)(Dean, Kevin) Modified to edit text on 9/20/2018 (cbru, ).
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Asurion Insurance Services, Inc. (cbru, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple Incorporated. (cbru, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronnie Portee.(cbru, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Incorporated, Asurion Insurance Services, Inc., John Does 1-10 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7918517) filed by Ronnie Portee. Service due by 10/29/2018(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portee v. Apple Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Portee
Represented By: Patrick Graham Maiden
Represented By: Kevin R Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan G Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asurion Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gray Thomas Culbreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?