WB Guimarin & Co Inc v. Walsh Federal LLC et al
Plaintiff: WB Guimarin & Co Inc
Defendant: Walsh Federal LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv02474
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, November 14, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 10/25/18. (mflo, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by both Walsh Federal, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/25/18.(mflo, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by Walsh Federal LLC.(Kelley, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Kelley, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/7/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kelley, Bryan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Walsh Federal LLC answer due 10/24/2018; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 10/24/2018. (Kelley, Bryan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 12 Reason: refiled by filing user using correct event with signature page; Corrected Filing Document Number #17 . (mflo, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WB Guimarin & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mailing and Proof of Service on Walsh Federal, #2 Exhibit Letter to Walsh's Registered Agent, #3 Exhibit Green Card and Receipt from USPS)(Heyward, Caitlin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 Amended Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal LLC. (mflo, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10 Reason: duplicate filing and attachments that should be filed separately. Corrected Filing Document Number #11 , #9 (mflo, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walsh Federal LLC.(Kelley, Bryan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Kelley, Bryan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America for the use of H2 Mechanical, LLC, assignee of W.B. Guimarin & Co., Inc..(Heyward, Caitlin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America for the use of H2 Mechanical, LLC, assignee of W.B. Guimarin & Co., Inc.. Service due by 12/31/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Amended Complaint) (Heyward, Caitlin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Patrick Kelley on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal LLC (Kelley, Bryan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by WB Guimarin & Co Inc. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Heyward, Caitlin)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal LLC. (abuc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by WB Guimarin & Co Inc.(abuc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7985548.), filed by WB Guimarin & Co Inc. Service due by 12/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bond)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Guimarin & Co Inc v. Walsh Federal LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsh Federal LLC
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Guimarin & Co Inc
Represented By: Caitlin C Heyward
Represented By: Henry P Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?