Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc. v. KeyBank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC, FC Midlands, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, KeyBank National Association and FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02665
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/7/2018.(cbru, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron C. Jackson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8095241) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Application of Aaron C. Jackson, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Knowlton, Francis)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett D. Anders ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8095205) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Application of Brett D. Anders, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Knowlton, Francis)
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association. Re-filed by Clerk to correct event type. (mdea )
November 2, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by FC Midlands, LLC, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC. Re-filed by Clerk to correct event type. (mdea )
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/2/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Subordination Agreements)(Mann, Jenkins)
October 26, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/2/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Letter dated August 15, 2018 and Subordination Agreements, #2 Exhibit B. Letter dated August 20, 2018)(Mann, Jenkins)
October 17, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/17/2018.(mdea )
October 17, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mann, Jenkins) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/17/2018) (mdea, ).
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc..(Blake, Shaun)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than October 30, 2018. (cbru, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/10/2018.(cbru, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/9/2018.(cbru, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Knowlton, Francis) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2018 (cbru, ).
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by FC Midlands, LLC, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Malloy, Kevin) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2018 (cbru, ).
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 10/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by FC Midlands, LLC, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Malloy, Kevin) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2018 (cbru, ).
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petrina A. McDaniel (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8038348) by FC Midlands, LLC, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Malloy, Kevin) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2018 (cbru, ).
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 Supplemental Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association.(Knowlton, Francis) Modified to edit text on 10/4/2018 (cbru, ).
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FC Midlands, LLC, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC.(Malloy, Kevin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by FC Midlands, LLC, FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC, FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC, FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC. (Malloy, Kevin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Acknowledgment of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Knowlton, Francis) Modified to edit text on 10/1/2018 (cbru, ).
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, and KeyBank National Association's response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #3 is incomplete. These parties are directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 10/4/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/1/2018. (cbru, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association.(cbru, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-40-04640.(Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8026547) filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B-Notice to State Court, #3 Certificate of Service)(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/1/2018) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc. v. KeyBank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Represented By: Francis B Knowlton
Represented By: Aaron C Jackson
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Real Estate - Rock Hill, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Represented By: Petrina A McDaniel
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Midlands, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Represented By: Petrina A McDaniel
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Represented By: Francis B Knowlton
Represented By: Aaron C Jackson
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Real Estate - Garden City, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Represented By: Petrina A McDaniel
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank National Association
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Represented By: Francis B Knowlton
Represented By: Aaron C Jackson
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Real Estate - Harbison, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Represented By: Petrina A McDaniel
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmetto Assisted Living Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Shaun Christian Blake
Represented By: Jenkins McMillan Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?