Tightlines UV Technology LLC v. Pure Fishing Inc
Plaintiff: Tightlines UV Technology LLC
Defendant: Pure Fishing Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02709
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Joint by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. (Nickles, Matthew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 43 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Chief Judge Terry L Wooten no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #38 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and Mediation Deadlines. The new deadline to complete fact discovery and file motions to compel discovery is February 24, 2020. The new deadline to complete mediation is March 13, 2020. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on December 4, 2019.(kbos)
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have until November 27, 2019 to respond to Defendants Motions to Compel. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on December 2, 2019.(kbos)
November 27, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Response filed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 9.16.19 Email, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 11.26.19 Email Chain, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2nd Supp Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFP No. 1-53, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 2nd Supp. Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFPs No. 54-57)(Nickles, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Response filed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 9.16.19 Email, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 11.26.19 Email Chain, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2nd Supp. Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFPs No. 1-53, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 2nd Supp. Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFPs No. 54-57)(Nickles, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery and Mediation Deadlines by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nickles, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to respond to Defendants' Motions to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 35,36) by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2019. Nickles, Matthew) Modified on 11/25/2019 to correct motion relief (kbos).
November 11, 2019 Filing 36 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Declaration of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #14 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #15 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #16 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #17 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard)No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert)
November 11, 2019 Filing 35 SEALED MOTION to Compel Interrogatories by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Declaration of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, #13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard)No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Seal, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on November 8, 2019.(kbos)
November 1, 2019 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 34-37 Reason: documents were filed prematurely. The filings may be re-filed after the district judge has ruled on the motion to seal. (kbos)
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Defendant's Motions to Compel and Certain Exhibits to the Declarations of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motions to Compel by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '728 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Allbaits Order, #3 Exhibit C - Dictionary Def of "peak", #4 Exhibit D - Prosecution history, #5 Exhibit E - Color Vision Chap 4, #6 Exhibit F - Principles of Instrumental Analysis, #7 Exhibit G - Limit of Blank article, #8 Exhibit H - Limits of Detection in Spectroscopy article, #9 Exhibit I - Protocols for Determination of Limits, #10 Exhibit J - Decl. of Iezzi)(Nickles, Matthew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 31 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '728 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Allbait claim construction order, #3 Exhibit C - Dictionary definition of "peak")(Nickles, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on October 2, 2019.(kbos)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nickles, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing. The new deadline for parties to exchange opening claim construction briefs and submit technical tutorials is October 3, 2019. The new deadline for parties to exchange rebuttal claim construction briefs is October 14, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on September 19, 2019.(kbos)
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Nickles, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2020, Mediation Due by 1/15/2020, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on August 6, 2019. (kbos)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 DISCOVERY ORDER, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on August 6, 2019. (kbos)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. (Nickles, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on July 17, 2019. (kbos)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Redline of Proposed Order and Standard Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McWilliams, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Jacqueline Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on April 9, 2019.(kbos)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Robert Leonard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on April 9, 2019.(kbos)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for John Harbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on April 9, 2019.(kbos)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline K. Burt ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8364163) by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Nickles, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert J. Leonard ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8342826) by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert J. Leonard and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Harbin ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8342809) by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John W. Harbin and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(Nickles, Matthew)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(Nickles, Matthew)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Travis Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on March 15, 2019.(kbos)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Travis Edwards Lynch ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8290694) by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application of Travis Edwards Lynch)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nickles, Matthew)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/6/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/20/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 3/20/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/13/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/6/2019, Discovery due by 10/23/2019, Motions due by 11/7/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/6/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/6/2020, Mediation Due by 12/6/2019, Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on February 14, 2019. (kbos)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pure Fishing Inc.(McWilliams, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Pure Fishing Inc.(McWilliams, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Pure Fishing Inc answer due 2/13/2019. (Nickles, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Pure Fishing Inc served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Nickles, Matthew) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/3/2019 with corrected pdf) (kbos).
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (kbos)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(kbos)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pure Fishing Inc. (kbos)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pure Fishing Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8038237.), filed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Service due by 1/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, US Patent, #2 Exhibit B, Analysis of Berkeley Flatnose Minnow, #3 Exhibit C, Spectral Analysis Report, #4 Exhibit D, Berkeley Website Maxscent Flatnose Minnow, #5 Exhibit E - Berkeley Website Maxscent the General, #6 Exhibit F - Tacklewarehouse website, #7 Exhibit G - Walmart website)(kbos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tightlines UV Technology LLC v. Pure Fishing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tightlines UV Technology LLC
Represented By: Matthew Anderson Nickles
Represented By: Jacqueline K Burt
Represented By: Travis Edwards Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Fishing Inc
Represented By: John W Harbin
Represented By: Robert James Leonard
Represented By: Robert Hall McWilliams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?