Jumper v. Rozlin Financial Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vanesa Jumper
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Rozlin Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02787
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 10 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/30/2018. (cbru, )
November 30, 2018 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 1/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/28/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/29/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/29/2019, Discovery due by 5/28/2019, Motion in Limine due by 9/9/2019, Motions due by 6/12/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/26/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 9/30/2019, Mediation Due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/30/2018. (cbru, )
November 29, 2018 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Rozlin Financial Group, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Echols, Chad) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/30/2018) (cbru, ).
November 29, 2018 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rozlin Financial Group, Inc..(Echols, Chad)
November 29, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rozlin Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Echols, Chad) Modified to add description to attachment on 11/30/2018 (cbru, ).
November 2, 2018 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Rozlin Financial Group, Inc. answer due 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent for Extension)(Echols, Chad)
October 15, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Rozlin Financial Group, Inc. (cbru, )
October 12, 2018 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Vanesa Jumper.(cbru, )
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, Rozlin Financial Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8052068) filed by Vanesa Jumper. Service due by 1/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Plaintiff)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jumper v. Rozlin Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rozlin Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanesa Jumper
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Norsworthy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?