Luczak v. Delta Management Associates Inc

Plaintiff: Meagan Luczak
Defendant: Delta Management Associates Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02888
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Delta Management Associates Inc.(Weatherly, Lee)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/14/2019, Fact Discovery due by 7/19/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/23/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/30/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/21/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2019, Expert Witness Discovery due by 10/30/2019, Motion in Limine due by 12/15/2019, Motions due by 12/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/15/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 1/8/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 1/15/2020, Mediation Due by 8/15/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/5/2018. (asni, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Meagan Luczak.(Maxfield, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Meagan Luczak. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Maxfield, David)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 4/24/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/1/2018. (asni, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/21/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/5/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 12/5/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/18/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/18/2019, Discovery due by 4/17/2019, Motion in Limine due by 7/5/2019, Motions due by 5/1/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/5/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/30/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 8/6/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/1/2018. (asni, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Originally filed in Richland State Court by Delta Management Associates Inc. (Weatherly, Lee)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Meagan Luczak.(Maxfield, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Delta Management Associates Inc.(asni, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Delta Management Associates Inc.(asni, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2018-CP-40-04961. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8073665), filed by Delta Management Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Documents)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luczak v. Delta Management Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Management Associates Inc
Represented By: Lee Cannon Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Luczak
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?