Jordan v. District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
Plaintiff: Diana Jordan
Defendant: District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
Case Number: 3:2018cv02924
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Expedited Ruling by Diana Jordan. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation by Diana Jordan. Reply to Objections due by 11/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Diana Jordan. (lbak)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge deny Plaintiff's #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If the district judge accepts this recommendation, it is further recommended Plaintiff be allowed 14 days from the date of the order denying indigent status to submit the required $400 filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 11/1/2018. (lbak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Diana Jordan. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence, filed by Diana Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?