United States of America v. 49,520.00 Dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 49,520.00 Dollars in United States Currency
Claimant: Chase Jasper Williams
Case Number: 3:2018cv03034
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The parties have failed to comply with the Conference and Scheduling Order (Dkt No. #12 ) by failing to file Responses to Local Rule 26.03 Interrogatories in conjunction with the Rule 26(f) Report by January 3, 2019. Counsel shall file the required responses to interrogatories within ten calendar days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions, which may, without further notice, include dismissal of the action without prejudice, exclusion of some or all defenses, or a monetary sanction not to exceed $500. (Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories due by 1/14/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/4/2019. (cbru, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report by United States of America.(Sherard, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 12/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie) Modified to edit text on 12/11/2018 (cbru, ).
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 1/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/27/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/24/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/24/2019, Discovery due by 6/19/2019, Motion in Limine due by 11/8/2019, Motions due by 7/3/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/11/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2019, ADR Statement due by 7/31/2019, Mediation Due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/29/2018. (cbru, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chase Jasper Williams re #8 Claim. (Yonge, Jason) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 11/29/2018 (cbru, ).
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chase Jasper Williams re #8 Claim, #9 Answer to Complaint. (Yonge, Jason) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 11/29/2018 (cbru, ).
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chase Jasper Williams.(Yonge, Jason) Modified to edit text on 11/29/2018 (cbru, ). (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/29/2018) (cbru, ).
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 CLAIM by Chase Jasper Williams. (Yonge, Jason)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Thomas Yonge on behalf of Chase Jasper Williams (Yonge, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned 11/09/2018 as to $49,520.00 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest and Return of Warrant)(Sherard, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (cbru, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (cbru, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 49,520.00 Dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 2/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Agent Hardin)(cbru, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #2 Exhibit A-Photo of USC) (cbru, ). Modified to add Exhibit A which was filed in the shell case by United States of America but was inadvertently not filed with complaint by the Clerk at the time of case opening on 11/30/2018 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 49,520.00 Dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 49,520.00 Dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chase Jasper Williams
Represented By: Jason Thomas Yonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?