Lisenby v. Trans Union LLC et al

Plaintiff: Richard K. Lisenby
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv03084
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard K. Lisenby (Maxfield, David)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice as to Equifax Information Services, LLC to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/13/2018. (cbru, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Richard K. Lisenby (Maxfield, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 1/9/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/12/2018.(cbru, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Trans Union LLC answer due 12/19/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/5/2018.(cbru, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [With Plaintiff's Consent] by Trans Union LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Wilbur)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Trans Union LLC answer due 12/5/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/20/2018.(cbru, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Wilbur)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/12/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/19/2018.(cbru, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Response to Motion due by 12/3/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita) Modified to edit text on 11/19/2018 (cbru, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard K. Lisenby.(Maxfield, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(cbru, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-40-05359 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8108417) filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Joinder in and Consent to Removal)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisenby v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Lisenby
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?