Dunn v. PMAB LLC

Plaintiff: Sandra Dunn
Defendant: PMAB LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv03127
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/31/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/10/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/10/2019, Discovery due by 9/30/2019, Motions due by 10/30/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/7/2020, Mediation Due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/17/18. (mflo, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2018. Court to file scheduling order. Court Reporter not present. (mflo, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, December 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on on 11/27/18. (mflo, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PMAB LLC identifying Corporate Parent Coffey-Polk Enterprises LLC, Corporate Parent Meduit Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent NP/RCM Holdings, LLC for PMAB LLC.. (Staples, Christian)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 PMAB's ANSWER to Complaint by PMAB LLC.(Staples, Christian)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sandra Dunn.(Maxfield, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by PMAB LLC.(mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-40-5433. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8116384), filed by PMAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mdea )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. PMAB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMAB LLC
Represented By: Christian Hart Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dunn
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?