Agile Infrastructure Services LLC v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Agile Infrastructure Services LLC
Defendant: Daniel Lee, Michelle Lee and Carla Morse
Case Number: 3:2018cv03310
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel Lee, Michelle Lee.(Killen, Patrick)
January 22, 2019 Filing 25 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/11/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/25/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/25/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/8/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/7/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/7/2019, Discovery due by 7/8/2019, Motion in Limine due by 8/30/2019, Motions due by 7/22/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/30/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 9/24/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/1/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/22/2019. (asni, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 7/15/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/22/2019. (asni, )
January 21, 2019 Filing 23 Letter. (Keffer, John)
January 21, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carla Morse.(Keffer, John)
January 19, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daniel Lee, Michelle Lee.(Killen, Patrick)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/11/2019.(asni, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/11/2019.(asni, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/11/2019.(asni, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Laurel Nash ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8206367) by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sarah Laurel Nash)No proposed order.(Knowlton, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew E. Feinberg ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8206355) by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew E. Feinberg)No proposed order.(Knowlton, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul W. Mengel, III ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8206247) by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew E. Feinberg)No proposed order.(Knowlton, Robert) Modified to edit text on 1/11/2019 (asni, ).
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Daniel Lee answer due 1/21/2019; Michelle Lee answer due 1/21/2019. (Killen, Patrick)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Killen on behalf of Daniel Lee, Michelle Lee (Killen, Patrick)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC. Michelle Lee served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Michelle Lee)(Knowlton, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC. Daniel Lee served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Daniel Lee)(Knowlton, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Carla Morse. Carla Morse served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. refiled by the clerk to correct event type. (asni, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John S Keffer on behalf of Carla Morse (Keffer, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michelle Lee. (bshr, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Daniel Lee. (bshr, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carla Morse. (bshr, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC.(bshr, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Lee, Michelle Lee, Carla Morse ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8149079.), filed by Agile Infrastructure Services LLC. Service due by 3/7/2019(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agile Infrastructure Services LLC v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lee
Represented By: Patrick M Killen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lee
Represented By: Patrick M Killen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Morse
Represented By: John S Keffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agile Infrastructure Services LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Halligan Black
Represented By: Robert Yates Knowlton
Represented By: Sarah Laurel Nash
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Represented By: Paul W Mengel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?