Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc v. RSM US LLP
Plaintiff: Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc
Defendant: RSM US LLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc. (Nickles, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY by Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #13 Reply . (Brehmer, Karl)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Response filed by RSM US LLP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/27/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Understanding, #2 Exhibit B - Master Services Agreement)(Marion, William)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . (Brehmer, Karl)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Services Agreement)No proposed order.(Nickles, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/6/2019) (asni, ). Modified to place document right side up on 2/6/2019 (asni, ).
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 7/29/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/6/2019. (asni, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/26/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 3/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/22/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/22/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/21/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/21/2019, Discovery due by 7/22/2019, Motion in Limine due by 11/1/2019, Motions due by 8/5/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 11/27/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/3/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/6/2019. (asni, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc by RSM US LLP.(Major, Denny)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc.(Moore, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Lexington County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Removal)(Major, Denny)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. RSM US LLP answer due 2/5/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/9/2019.(asni, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by RSM US LLP. Response to Motion due by 1/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Major, Denny)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by RSM US LLP.(asni, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County, case number 2018-CP-32-04185. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8197290), filed by RSM US LLP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc v. RSM US LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter P Rawl & Sons Inc
Represented By: Karl Stephen Brehmer
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: Matthew Anderson Nickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM US LLP
Represented By: Denny Parker Major
Represented By: William Francis Marion, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?