Spradley et al v. Burke

Plaintiff: Paula M Spradley and Joey C Spradley, Sr
Defendant: Pierre Van Burke
Case Number: 3:2019cv00407
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 9/16/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/27/2019. (asni, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/10/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/10/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/9/2019, Discovery due by 9/9/2019, Motion in Limine due by 11/1/2019, Motions due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 11/26/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/3/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/27/2019. (asni, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pierre Van Burke.(Grantland, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Paula M Spradley, Joey C Spradley, Sr. Pierre Van Burke served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Fulda, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joey C Spradley, Sr, Paula M Spradley.(asni, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pierre Van Burke. (asni, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pierre Van Burke ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8266067.), filed by Paula M Spradley, Joey C Spradley, Sr. Service due by 5/13/2019(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spradley et al v. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula M Spradley
Represented By: Cheryl F Perkins
Represented By: John Eric Fulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey C Spradley, Sr
Represented By: Cheryl F Perkins
Represented By: John Eric Fulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Van Burke
Represented By: John M Grantland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?