Bouknight v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Frances S. Bouknight
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2019cv00456
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Hodges, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Hodges, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Hodges, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Frances S. Bouknight.(Polvi, Shannon)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 4/1/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/23/2019, Discovery due by 9/20/2019, Motions due by 10/7/2019, Mediation Due by 12/4/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 2/25/2019. (bgoo)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Frances S. Bouknight.(Polvi, Shannon)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Hodges, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (bgoo)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-00435, filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8273826) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouknight v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances S. Bouknight
Represented By: James Lewis Cromer
Represented By: Shannon Polvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Robert Hayne Hodges, III
Represented By: Lillian Marshall Coleman Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?