KBC Asset Management NV v. Marsh et al
Plaintiff: KBC Asset Management NV
Defendant: Gregory E Aliff, Sharon A Decker, Alfredo Trujillo, James W Roquemore, Jimmy Addison, D Maybank Hagood, Kevin Marsh, Maceo K Sloan, John F.A.V. Cecil, Lynne M Miller, Steven Bryne and James A Bennett
Case Number: 3:2019cv01457
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jimmy Addison, James A Bennett, Steven Bryne, D Maybank Hagood, Kevin Marsh, James W Roquemore.(Massalon, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Melissa A. Fortunato to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/10/2019.(mdea )
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Lawrence P. Eagel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/10/2019.(mdea )
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Massalon, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Fortunato ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8547349) by KBC Asset Management NV. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Newman, Graham)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence P. Eagel ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8547329) by KBC Asset Management NV. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Por Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Newman, Graham)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Response filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Newman, Graham)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Jimmy Addison, Gregory E Aliff, James A Bennett, Steven Bryne, John F.A.V. Cecil, Sharon A Decker, D Maybank Hagood, Kevin Marsh, Lynne M Miller, James W Roquemore, Maceo K Sloan, Alfredo Trujillo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Massalon, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Jimmy Addison, James A Bennett, Steven Bryne, Kevin Marsh, James W Roquemore, D Maybank Hagood. Re-filed by Clerk to correct event type. (mdea ) Modified on 6/24/2019 to add applicable party as listed on document (mdea, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KBC Asset Management NV. Jimmy Addison waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Steven Bryne waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Kevin Marsh waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Newman, Graham)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KBC Asset Management NV. Gregory E Aliff waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; James A Bennett waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; John F.A.V. Cecil waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Sharon A Decker waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; D Maybank Hagood waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Lynne M Miller waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Maceo K Sloan waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Alfredo Trujillo waiver executed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Newman, Graham)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by KBC Asset Management NV. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Newman, Graham)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by KBC Asset Management NV.(Newman, Graham)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Maceo K Sloan, Lynne M Miller, Gregory E Aliff, D Maybank Hagood, James W Roquemore, James A Bennett, Sharon A Decker, Alfredo Trujillo, John F.A.V. Cecil, Jimmy Addison, Steven Byrne, Kevin Marsh. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 6/10/2019. (mdea ) Modified on 6/11/2019 to edit text (mdea, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gregory E Aliff, James A Bennett, John F.A.V. Cecil, Sharon A Decker, D Maybank Hagood, Lynne M Miller, James W Roquemore, Maceo K Sloan, Alfredo Trujillo, Kevin Marsh, Steven Byrne, Jimmy Addison. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Massalon, John) Modified on 6/11/2019 to add all filers as listed on document (mdea, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no late than June 18, 2019.(mdea )
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KBC Asset Management NV. James W Roquemore served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit State Affidavit of Service)(Newman, Graham)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY by Gregory E Aliff, John F.A.V. Cecil, Sharon A Decker, Lynne M Miller, Maceo K Sloan, Alfredo Trujillo to #4 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (Massalon, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lynne M Miller, Maceo K Sloan, Gregory E Aliff, Sharon A Decker, Alfredo Trujillo, John F.A.V. Cecil, ( Response to Motion due by 5/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/20/2019. (mdea )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gregory E Aliff, John F.A.V. Cecil, Sharon A Decker, Lynne M Miller, Maceo K Sloan, Alfredo Trujillo.(mdea )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-2522. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8453791), filed by Gregory E Aliff, Lynne M Miller, Maceo K Sloan, John F.A.V. Cecil, Alfredo Trujillo, Sharon A Decker. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Docket Sheet)(mdea )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KBC Asset Management NV v. Marsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory E Aliff
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon A Decker
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Trujillo
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Roquemore
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Addison
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Maybank Hagood
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Marsh
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maceo K Sloan
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F.A.V. Cecil
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne M Miller
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Bryne
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Bennett
Represented By: John Allen Massalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By: Mark Dale Chappell
Represented By: Graham Lee Newman
Represented By: Melissa A Fortunato
Represented By: Lawrence P Eagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?