Progressive Northern Insurance Company v. C & R Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Terrance Wilson, Eric Marshall, C & R Enterprises, LLC and Bobby Clifton Jeremiah Stokes
Case Number: 3:2019cv01486
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. C & R Enterprises, LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Murphy, John) Modified to edit text on 7/17/2019 (cbru, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Terrance Wilson served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Murphy, John) Modified to edit text on 7/17/2019 (cbru, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Bobby Clifton Jeremiah Stokes waiver executed on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Murphy, John) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/18/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #2 Executed Waiver) (cbru, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C & R Enterprises, LLC, Eric Marshall, Bobby Clifton Jeremiah Stokes, Terrance Wilson. (cbru, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(cbru, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C & R Enterprises, LLC, Eric Marshall, Bobby Clifton Jeremiah Stokes, Terrance Wilson (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8459964) filed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Service due by 8/20/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Northern Insurance Company v. C & R Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: John Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & R Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Clifton Jeremiah Stokes
Represented By: Vincent A Sheheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?