Sanders v. Herin et al
Plaintiff: Eric Alan Sanders
Defendant: Disability Determination Services, SC ODAR, LaNieta Carter, H Corn and Walter C Herin, Jr
Case Number: 3:2019cv01503
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #9 Proper Form Order and two blank Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Eric Alan Sanders, Post Office Box 885, Barnwell, SC 29812 (bgoo)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 7/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motions granted: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/2/2019. (bgoo) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit text. (bgoo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eric Alan Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Eric Alan Sanders. Response to Motion due by 6/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric Alan Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Herin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Determination Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC ODAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaNieta Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Corn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter C Herin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Alan Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?